Radvansky v. Grade Point Resources, LLC et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | J Nicholas Ranjan |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00534 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Grade Point Resources, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rebecca Moyes
|
|
Plaintiff
Lindsay Radvansky
|
Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Fri 04/12 2:17 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GRADE POINT RESOURCES, LLC. (Saul, Charles) Modified text on 4/12/2024. (kss) |
|
6 | 6
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 04/12 12:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LINDSAY RADVANSKY. REBECCA MOYES waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Bahorich, Justin) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 04/12 12:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LINDSAY RADVANSKY. GRADE POINT RESOURCES, LLC waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Bahorich, Justin) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/12 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle T. McGee on behalf of GRADE POINT RESOURCES, LLC, REBECCA MOYES. (McGee, Kyle) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 04/12 11:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Saul on behalf of GRADE POINT RESOURCES, LLC, REBECCA MOYES. (Saul, Charles) |
|
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 1:36 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re3 Notice of Appearance,4 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 4/19/2024. (kss) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 8:37 AM
Summons Issued as to GRADE POINT RESOURCES, LLC, REBECCA MOYES (kss) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Moyes | ||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Tue 04/09 6:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Grade Point Resources, LLC, Rebecca Moyes (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8207344), filed by Lindsay Radvansky. (Bahorich, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/10 8:27 AM
Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. (kss) |