Bingham v. Giant Eagle, Inc.
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Nora Barry Fischer |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00536 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Giant Eagle, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Roy Bingham
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/30 6:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROY BINGHAM. GIANT EAGLE, INC. waiver sent on 4/25/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Ward, Joshua) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 4:37 PM
ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 4/29/2024. (lyk) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/29 4:36 PM
ORDER RE: Motions Practice. Details more fully stated in Order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 4/29/2024. (lyk) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice of ADR Designation
Mon 04/29 4:35 PM
NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (lyk) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Thu 04/25 4:24 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by GIANT EAGLE, INC.. (Brailey, Taylor) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor N. Brailey on behalf of GIANT EAGLE, INC.. (Brailey, Taylor) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/25 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore A. Schroeder on behalf of GIANT EAGLE, INC.. (Schroeder, Theodore) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/25 9:07 AM
Summons Issued as to GIANT EAGLE, INC. (jkn) |
|
3 | 3
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Thu 04/25 5:53 AM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ROY BINGHAM (Ward, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
misc
Errata (to be used by filers)
Thu 04/25 5:53 AM
Errata re1 COMPLAINT by ROY BINGHAM. Reason for Correction: Cover sheet missing information.. (Ward, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/10 10:31 AM
Judge Nora Barry Fischer added. (jkn) |
||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Wed 04/10 10:36 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Cover sheet missing county of residence for plaintiff. CORRECTION: File an errata with a cover sheet that includes plaintiff's county of residence. (jkn) |
||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Wed 04/10 10:39 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Summons form missing attorney return information. CORRECTION: File a praecipe to issue summons with the corrected proposed summons as an attachment. (jkn) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Tue 04/09 7:24 PM
COMPLAINT against Giant Eagle, Inc. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8207357), filed by Roy Bingham. (Ward, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |