Peregoncev v. United States Steel Corporation
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | David S Cercone |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00537 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
United States Steel Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Irina Peregoncev
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Errata (to be used by filers)
Tue 04/23 2:35 PM
Errata re1 COMPLAINT by IRINA PEREGONCEV. Reason for Correction: CORRECTED COVER SHEET. (Bahorich, Justin) |
|
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/23 2:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by IRINA PEREGONCEV. UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION waiver sent on 4/12/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Bahorich, Justin) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
misc
QC - Generic (only use if no other QC events apply)
Fri 04/12 9:43 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Civil Cover Sheet missing Plaintiff's county of residence. CORRECTION: File corrected civil cover sheet using the event Errata. (rtm) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 3:50 PM
Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION (rtm) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/10 3:46 PM
Judge David S. Cercone Presiding. (rtm) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Tue 04/09 7:56 PM
COMPLAINT against United States Steel Corporation (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8207359), filed by Irina Peregoncev. (Bahorich, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |