Larkin Street Homes, LLC v. Harris
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Boulee |
Referred: | Catherine M Salinas |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01486 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Cherice Harris
& All Other Occupants 1441 Woodmont Lane NW 3484
Atlanta, GA 30318 |
|
Plaintiff
Larkin Street Homes, LLC
312 Sycamore Stree 3rd Floor
Decator, GA 30030 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
Remark
Thu 04/11 9:59 AM
Case electronically remanded to Superior Court of Fulton County re3 Order. Certified copy of remand order sent electronically via Odyssey. Filing status: Accepted. (nmb) Modified filing status on 4/11/2024 (nmb) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/11 9:57 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cherice Harris re3 Order. (nmb) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order ruling on IFP
Thu 04/11 9:30 AM
ORDER : It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action be remanded to the Superior Court of Fulton County, Georgia, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c). Harris's request to proceed IFP is GRANTED solely for the purpose of remand. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 4/10/2024. c:Financial Office(nmb) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 9:25 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Cherice Harris.(nmb) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/11 9:50 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (nmb) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 3:00 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (gww) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 2:55 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cherice Harris.(gww) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |