Grubbs v. Quebec Miya et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Victoria M Calvert |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01495 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Insight Logistics Management, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Protective Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Quebec Miya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorraine Grubbs
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Leave of Absence
Wed 05/01 3:03 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 13-14 2024, June 18-21 2024, July 1-5 2024, September 2-6 2024, by Zachary Musholt Matthews. (Matthews, Zachary) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Leave of Absence
Fri 04/19 2:59 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 13th, 14th, 17th, 18th, 19th 2024, July 12th, 15th 2024, July 25-26th, July 29th -31st 2024, August 6th-9th 2024, and August 14th, 2024., by Chloe B. Thompson. (Thompson, Chloe) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Tue 04/09 2:20 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Insight Logistics Management, Inc., Protective Insurance Company, Quebec Miya. Discovery ends on 9/5/2024.(gww) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/09 2:16 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13347755) filed by Insight Logistics Management, Inc., Protective Insurance Company, Quebec Miya.(gww) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Pleadings from State Court Case, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Arkansas Secretary of State Corporate Entry of Insight Logistics Man, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Georgia Secretary of State Corporate Entry of Protective Insurance C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Demand Letter dated October 26, 2023, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in Fulton State Court, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |