In re Application of Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Granting Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah E Geraghty |
Referred: | J Clay Fuller |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01496 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1782 Assistance to foreign and international tribunals |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 8:06 AM EDT |
Plaintiff
Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Crawford & Company
5335 Triangle Parkway,NW
Peachtree Corners, GA 30092 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply Brief
Mon 04/22 4:59 PM
REPLY BRIEF re19 MOTION to Vacate Order Granting Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 MOTION to Quash filed by Crawford & Company. (Baroody, Anne) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 11:11 AM
Submission of19 MOTION to Vacate Order Granting Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 or MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (ane) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
21 | 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Vacate Order Granting Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 MOTION to Quash Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Respondent's Motions to Vacate and/or Quash filed by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation.(Williamson, J.) | |
Att: 1 Affidavit Levy Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Gonzalez Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Castillo and Esmeralda Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Santa Rosa Declaration | ||
utility
Case Reported Statistically
Tue 04/09 11:07 AM
Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:24-mi-00012-SEG-JCF. (ane) |
||
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
20 | 20 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crawford & Company identifying Other Affiliate Jess Crawford for Crawford & Company. (Baroody, Anne) | |
Submission of19 MOTION to Vacate Order Granting Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 or MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (sap) | ||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
Notification of Docket Correction re19 MOTION to Vacate or MOTION to Quash. Multi-part motion filed as only one motion. Additional motion added to entry and docket text modified toaccurately reflect filed document. (jbu) | ||
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
19 | 19 MOTION to Vacate Order Granting Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 Or MOTION to Quash Subpoena with Brief In Support by Crawford & Company. (Baroody, Anne) . Added MOTION to Quash on 3/19/2024 (jbu). | |
Att: 1 Brief Crawford & Company's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Vacate Order Granting Application Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 or to Quash Subpoena, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Declaration of Cyndymhae V. Yumang-Medina | ||
18 | 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Crawford & Company Rule 5.4 (Baroody, Anne) | |
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
17 | 17 ORDER GRANTING16 Consent Motion to Modify Case Management Schedule. The case management order entered on February 13, 2024 shall be MODIFIED as follows: See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 3/6/2024. (ane) | |
Tuesday, March 05, 2024 | ||
16 | 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Modify Case Management Schedule by Crawford & Company.(Baroody, Anne) Modified to edit text on 3/6/2024 (ane). | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines | ||
15 | 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne McDonough Horn Baroody, William J. Holley, II, and Rachel C. Bramblett on behalf of Crawford & Company (Baroody, Anne) Modified on 3/6/2024 (ane). | |
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
14 | 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation (Williamson, J.) | |
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER granting10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jessica Marder-Spiro. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 2/16/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane) | |
12 | 12 ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vincent Levy. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 2/16/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane) | |
11 | 11 ORDER granting7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregory J. Dubinsky. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 2/16/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ane) | |
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:10 APPLICATION for Admission of Jessica Marder-Spiro Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13223724) Attorney Jessica Marder-Spiro added appearing on behalf of Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs) | ||
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Jessica Marder-Spiro Pro Hac Vice.by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation. (Williamson, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. | |
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:8 APPLICATION for Admission of Vincent Levy Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Vincent Levy added appearing on behalf of Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13223738). E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp) | ||
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:7 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory J. Dubinsky Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Gregory Dubinsky added appearing on behalf of Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13223706). E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp) | ||
RETURN of9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jessica Marder-Spiro Pro Hac Vice. to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Attorney must list specific courts which they are admitted to. (cpp) | ||
Wednesday, February 14, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Jessica Marder-Spiro Pro Hac Vice.by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation. (Williamson, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. | |
8 | 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Vincent Levy Pro Hac Vice.by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation. (Williamson, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. | |
7 | 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory J. Dubinsky Pro Hac Vice.by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation. (Williamson, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. | |
RETURN of4 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory J. Dubinsky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13223706). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Applicant must list the correct division in the application. (djs) | ||
RETURN of5 APPLICATION for Admission of Jessica Marder-Spiro Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13223724). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Applicant must list the correct division in the application (djs) | ||
RETURN of6 APPLICATION for Admission of Vincent Levy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13223738). to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Applicant must list the correct division in the application (djs) | ||
Tuesday, February 13, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Vincent Levy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13223738).by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation. (Williamson, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. | |
5 | 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Jessica Marder-Spiro Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13223724).by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation. (Williamson, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. | |
4 | 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory J. Dubinsky Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13223706).by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation. (Williamson, J.) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. | |
3 | 3 ORDER GRANTING1 Application and Setting Case Management Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 2/13/2024. (ane) | |
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation. (Williamson, J.) | |
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Ex Parte Application for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Granting Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in a Foreign Proceeding by Plantation Bay Holdings Corporation.(ane) | |
Att: 1 Brief Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of L. Salve, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of V. Levy, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Filing Fee Paid: $ 52.00, receipt number AGANDC-13213858 (ane) |