Greene v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Totenberg |
Referred: | Russell G Vineyard |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01498 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
3
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 4:16 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CIVIL CASE NO. 1:24-cv-01498-AT-RGV, and CONSOLIDATE it with CIVIL CASE NO. 1:24-cv-1396-AT- RGV, and to TERMINATE AS MOOT the application to proceed in forma pauperis, [Doc.1 ], in CIVIL CASE NO. 1:24-cv-01498-AT-RGV. Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 4/11/2024. (tmf) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/11 4:17 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cedric Greene re2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,. (tmf) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/11 4:18 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard terminated from case. (tmf) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 1:49 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (pdt) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 1:47 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cedric Greene. (pdt) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |