Lomax v. Maddox et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Grimberg |
Referred: | J Elizabeth Mcbath |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01499 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 04/16 8:42 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dialo Lomax re2 Order. (tas) |
||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Forms Sent ~Util - Set Submission Deadline
Tue 04/16 8:39 AM
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to send Plaintiff a prisoner application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, stamped with the case number for this action. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this case, he is ORDERED, within 30 DAYS from the date of this Order, to either (1) pay the $350.00 filing fee and $55.00 administrative fee, or (2) complete and return the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with all required information, signatures, certifications, and attachments. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that this action may be dismissed for failure to (1) comply with this Court's Orders; see N.D. Ga. R. 41.3(A)(2); or (2) keep this Court advised of Plaintiff's current address; see id. 41.2(B). The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon Plaintiff's compliance with this Order or the expiration of the 30-day period. Forms sent to party: Affidavit to Proceed IFP. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath on 4/15/2024. (tas) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 04/09 12:01 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Dialo Lomax.(ajw) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 12:02 PM
Submission of1 Complaint for IFP and frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge J. Elizabeth McBath. (ajw) |