Sheffield Condominium Association, Inc. v. American Automobile Insurance Company et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Eleanor L Ross |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01502 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of Gwinnett County, 24-A-02097-11 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
American Automobile Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheffield Condominium Association, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
12
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/01 2:00 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 04/30 2:24 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:24-cv-01502-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2024. (jkb) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/09 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Segel on behalf of American Automobile Insurance Company, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Segel, Melissa) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Tue 04/09 12:17 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.(bmr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Tue 04/09 12:16 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by American Automobile Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 9/6/2024. (bmr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/09 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by American Automobile Insurance Company, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13348437) (bmr). Modified on 4/9/2024 to replace attachments to match documents filed in shell case (bgt). |
|
Att: 1 State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |