Goldstein v. Brown
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah E Geraghty |
Referred: | J Clay Fuller |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-01503 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:12 AM EDT |
Defendant
Cindrontoshia Brown
and All Others 455 Joseph E Lowery Blvd NW
Atlanta, GA 30314 |
|
Plaintiff
Sheldon Goldstein
2274 Salem Road Suite 106-140
Conyers, GA 30013 |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Fri 04/26 12:11 PM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 4/26/2024. (ane) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP
Fri 04/26 12:09 PM
ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal, filed by Cindrontoshia Brown. It is RECOMMENDED that the case be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Court GRANTS Defendant's1 request to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 4/26/2024. (ane) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 04/26 12:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Cindrontoshia Brown.(ane) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Fri 04/26 12:12 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Cindrontoshia Brown, Sheldon Goldstein re3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION,4 Order for Service. (ane) |
||
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/09 1:37 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cindrontoshia Brown.(bmr) |
|
Att: 1 Petition for Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 04/09 1:38 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (bmr) |