New Jersey District Court
Judge:Harvey Bartle
Case #: 1:24-cv-04106
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2024
Terminated:Nov 21, 2024
Case in other court:SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MONMOUTH COUNTY, MON L 000516 24
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 18, 2024 6:38 AM EDT
Defendant
ABC COMPANIES 1-10
Defendant
RICHARD ROES 1-10
Defendant
SEARCH QUARRY, INC.
Represented By
STEVEN M. RICHMAN
Clark Hill
contact info
Defendant
SEARCH QUARRY, LLC
Represented By
STEVEN M. RICHMAN
Clark Hill
contact info
Notice Only
PHV MYRIAH V. JAWORSKI
Notice Only
PHV CHIRAG H. PATEL
Plaintiff
PETER ANDREYEV
Represented By
RAJIV D. PARIKH
Pem Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ATLAS DATA PRIVACY CORPORATION
Represented By
RAJIV D. PARIKH
Pem Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PATRICK COLLIGAN
Represented By
RAJIV D. PARIKH
Pem Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE-1
Represented By
RAJIV D. PARIKH
Pem Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOE-2
Represented By
RAJIV D. PARIKH
Pem Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
EDWIN MALDONADO
Represented By
RAJIV D. PARIKH
Pem Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM SULLIVAN
Represented By
RAJIV D. PARIKH
Pem Law LLP
contact info

GPO Nov 20 2024
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 11/20/2024. (lm, )

Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
47 47 7 pgs appeal Order on Petition for Leave to Appeal Tue 03/18 3:09 PM
ORDER of USCA denying Petition for Leave of Appeal (ca3pdb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
46 46 misc Letter: Remand Thu 11/21 11:37 AM
Transmittal Letter for remanded case to Monmouth County Courthouse 71 Monument Park Freehold, NJ 07728-1266 State No: MON L 000516 24. Mailed certified copy of the Order remanding case. (lm, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 11/21 11:38 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (lm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
45 45 9 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Thu 11/21 11:36 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 11/20/2024. (lm, )
Related: [-]
44 44 40 pgs order Memorandum Thu 11/21 11:36 AM
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 11/20/2024. (lm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
43 43 misc Letter Wed 11/06 10:21 AM
Letter from Joinder Letter from Defendant Search Quarry, LLC. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
42 42 misc Transcript Tue 10/29 9:21 AM
Transcript of Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2024, before Judge Harvey Bartle, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sharon Ricci (267-249-8780). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 11/18/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2025. (lm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
41 41 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 10/22 2:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III: Motion Hearing held on 10/22/2024 re16 MOTION to Remand (consolidated) filed by JANE DOE-1, PETER ANDREYEV, PATRICK COLLIGAN, ATLAS DATA PRIVACY CORPORATION, EDWIN MALDONADO, WILLIAM SULLIVAN, JANE DOE-2. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter, Sharon Ricci (267-249-8780)) (db, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney List
Thursday, October 10, 2024
40 40 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 10/10 8:49 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re16 MOTION to Remand (consolidated) (PARIKH, RAJIV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Rajiv Parikh,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
39 39 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Thu 10/10 3:06 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by All Plaintiffs. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
38 38 misc Transcript Wed 10/09 8:59 AM
Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/1/2024, before Judge Harvey Bartle, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber John Kurz (856-576-7094). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 10/29/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2025. (lm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
37 37 16 pgs order Order Wed 10/02 1:47 PM
ORDER, The court will hold a discovery status conference on Thursday, October 3, 2024 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom No. 1, in the United States Courthouse in Camden, New Jersey. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 10/2/2024. (db, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
36 36 minutes Miscellaneous Hearing Wed 10/02 10:57 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III: Hearing on Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss held on the record on 10/1/2024. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter, John Kurz (856-576-7094)) (db, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney List
Thursday, September 26, 2024
35 35 9 pgs order Order Thu 09/26 2:54 PM
ORDER, The Court will hold Oral Argument on Tuesday, October 22, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 1 in the United States Courthouse in Camden, New Jersey regarding the motions of Plaintiffs to remand the above actions to the Superior Court of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 09/26/2024. (db, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
34 34 16 pgs order Order Tue 08/27 1:54 PM
ORDER scheduling Oral Argument on defts.' motions to dismiss for 10/1/2024 at 01:30 PM in Camden - Courtroom 1 before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA) III.). Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on August 27, 2024. (bf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
33 33 misc Letter Tue 08/20 2:23 PM
Letter from Letter from Rajiv D. Parikh, Esq. regarding Notice of Supplemental Submission re31 Brief.(PARIKH, RAJIV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Green v. U.S. Dept. of Justice -D.C. Cir. Opinion
Thursday, August 15, 2024
32 32 17 pgs order Order Thu 08/15 12:29 PM
ORDER vacating Court's Order of 7/10/24; setting schedule for facial challenging; and staying actions pending further order of the Court, etc.Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on August 15, 2024. (bf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
31 31 70 pgs respoth Brief Tue 08/06 4:34 PM
BRIEF in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss / Defendants' Consolidated Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint(PARIKH, RAJIV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
30 30 11 pgs order Order Wed 07/24 2:43 PM
ORDER vacating 6/3/2024 Order re: discovery & subject matter jurisdiction briefing; setting briefing schedule for opposition to motion for remand, etc. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 07/24/2024. (db, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
29 29 17 pgs order Order Wed 07/10 5:10 PM
ORDER re: Facial Challenge Scheduling and vacating Court's orders of May 8, 2024 & June 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 7/10/2024. (bf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
28 28 9 pgs order Order Thu 06/20 1:55 PM
ORDER directing pltfs. to produce a privilege log to defts. on or before 7/31, 2024 purs. to terms set forth in letter dated 6/19/24. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 6/20/2024. (db, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
27 27 9 pgs order Order Thu 06/13 12:30 PM
ORDER directing parties to report status of discussions regarding pltfs.' production of a privilege log on or before 6/20/24. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 6/13/2024. (bf, )
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Transcript Thu 06/13 11:06 AM
Transcript of Proceedings Status Conference held on 06/03/2024, before Judge Harvey Bartle III. Court Reporter/Transcriber John Kurz (856-576-7094). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 7/8/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/15/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2024. (db, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
25 25 misc Letter Tue 06/11 2:12 PM
Letter from Defendant Search Quarry, Inc.. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
24 24 13 pgs order Order Wed 06/05 9:24 AM
ORDER setting deadlines for production of certain documents, parties to meet and briefs to be filed. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 6/3/2024. (lm)
Related: [-]
23 23 15 pgs order Order Mon 06/03 4:50 PM
ORDER directing any entity seeking to file an amicus brief regarding the facial challenge to the constitutionality of Daniel's Law, file a petition with brief on or before 6/15/24. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on June 3, 2024. (bf, )
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Status Conference Mon 06/03 1:19 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III: Status Conference held on 6/3/2024. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter, John Kurz (856-576-7094)) (lm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 ATTORNEY SIGN-IN SHEET
21 21 misc Letter Mon 06/03 10:07 AM
Letter from Rajiv D. Parikh, Esq. regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction Discovery Disputes.(PARIKH, RAJIV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order regarding Jurisdiction Discovery
Monday, May 13, 2024
20 20 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/14 12:57 PM
ORDER: The Court will conduct a Status Conference on 6/3/2024 at 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 1 before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA) III. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 5/13/2024. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
19 19 misc Transcript Tue 05/14 12:52 PM
Transcript of Status Conference held on 5/7/2024, before Judge Bartle. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ann Marie Mitchell (856-576-7018). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 5/30/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
18 18 17 pgs order Order Mon 05/13 3:03 PM
ORDER setting deadlines for filing of certain motions & briefs and staying action until further order of the Court etc. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 5/08/2024. (db, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
17 17 minutes Status Conference Mon 05/13 11:29 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III: Status Conference held on 5/7/2024. (Court Reporter, Ann Marie Mitchell (856-576-7018)) (bf, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet
Monday, May 06, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/06 9:21 AM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Remand (consolidated) . Motion set for 6/3/2024 before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA) III. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
16 16 motion Remand Fri 05/03 3:05 PM
MOTION to Remand (consolidated) by All Plaintiffs.(PARIKH, RAJIV)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certification of Rajiv D. Parikh,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - F to certification,
Att: 4 Certification pursuant to L. Civ. R. 11.2,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 04/24 2:51 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Myriah Jaworski to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15313575.) (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 04/24 2:49 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Chirag H. Patel to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15313564.) (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Wed 04/24 4:28 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHIRAG H. PATEL and MYRIAH V. JAWORSKI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
13 13 15 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/22 12:40 PM
ORDER scheduling status conference and staying actions through 5/7/24 except pltfs.' motions to remand, ( Status Conference set for 5/7/2024 at 02:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 1 before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA) III.) Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on April 22, 2024. (bf, )
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Transcript Mon 04/22 11:14 AM
Transcript of Status Conference held on 4/18/2024, before Judge Bartle. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ann Marie Mitchell (856-576-7018). NOTICE REGARDING (1) REDACTION OF PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN TRANSCRIPTS AND (2) MOTION TO REDACT AND SEAL: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript to comply with Fed.R.Civ.P.5.2(a) (personal identifiers). Parties seeking to redact and seal this Transcript, or portions thereof, pursuant to L.Civ.R. 5.3(g) must e-file a Motion to Redact and Seal utilizing the event `Redact and Seal Transcript/Digital Recording`. Redaction Request to Court Reporter/Transcription Agency due, but not filed, by 5/13/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/22/2024. (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
11 11 14 pgs order Order Fri 04/19 1:22 PM
ORDER directing plaintiffs to file any motions to remand and any supporting briefs on or before by 5/3/24 and plaintiffs shall provide to each defendant a list of Covered persons under Daniel's Law who requested deletion of any privacy information, etc. on or before 5/17/24. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 4/18/24. (ar1, )
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Status Conference Fri 04/19 12:04 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III: Status Conference held on 4/18/2024. (Court Reporter, Ann Marie Mitchell (856-576-7018)) (db, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney List
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/16 3:10 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chirag H. Patel and Myriah Jaworski. Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on 4/10/2024. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
8 8 order Order Reassigning Case Wed 04/10 7:33 AM
TEXT ORDER REALLOCATING CASE. Case Number 3:24-cv-4106 reallocated to Camden as 1:24-cv-4106. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/9/2024. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
7 7 14 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 04/09 11:21 AM
ORDER setting status conference and staying matter through 4/18/2024, ( Status Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 1 before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA) III.). Signed by Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III on April 8, 2024. (bf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
Set Deadlines as to5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 5/6/2024 before Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA) III. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
6 6 ORDER OF DESIGNATION OF DISTRICT JUDGE FOR SERVICE IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITHIN THE CIRCUIT. The Honorable Harvey Bartle, III of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania designated. Signed by Chief Judge Michael A. Chagares (USCA) on 4/2/2024.(gxh)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by SEARCH QUARRY, INC., SEARCH QUARRY, LLC.(RICHMAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Steven M. RIchman,
Att: 2 Declaration of Chirag H. Patel,
Att: 3 Declaration of Myriah Jaworski,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Judge Harvey Bartle (EDPA), III added. Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni and Judge Michael A. Shipp no longer assigned to case. (gxh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
Clerk`s Text Order - The2 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SEARCH QUARRY, INC., SEARCH QUARRY, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/12/2024. (amv)
Related: [-]
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application2 filed by STEVEN RICHMAN on 3/25/24 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (amv)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
4 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SEARCH QUARRY, LLC identifying Search Quarry Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
3 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SEARCH QUARRY, INC.. (RICHMAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
2 2 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Search Quarry Inc and Search Quarry LLC. Attorney STEVEN M. RICHMAN for SEARCH QUARRY, INC.,STEVEN M. RICHMAN for SEARCH QUARRY, LLC added. (RICHMAN, STEVEN) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/26/2024) (amv).
Related: [-]
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jdg)
Related: [-]
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SEARCH QUARRY, INC., SEARCH QUARRY, LLC from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number MON-L-000516-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15206564), filed by SEARCH QUARRY, INC., SEARCH QUARRY, LLC.(RICHMAN, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet