Buckley et al v. Anderson et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael J Newman |
Referred: | Peter B Silvain, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00107 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Robert Anderson
4990 Highway 63 S
Imboden, AR 72434 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medical Mutual of Ohio
9050 Centre Pointe Drive, Suite 255
West Chester, OH 45069 |
|
Defendant
Tweedy Transport, Inc.
3844 Highway 67 South
Pocahontas, AR 72455 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Westfield Insurance Co.
One Park Circle P.O. Box 5001
Westfield Center, OH 44521 |
|
Plaintiff
Boe Buckley
974 E. Winnerlane Road
Eaton, OH 45320 |
|
Plaintiff
Darrell Buckley
974 E. Winnerlane Road
Eaton, OH 45320 |
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Buckley
974 E. Winnerlane Road
Eaton, OH 45320 |
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Buckley, as Parent and Natural Guardian of Benson Buckley, a minor
974 E. Winnerlane Road
Eaton, OH 45320 |
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Buckley, as Parent and Natural Guardian of Bentleigh Buckley, a minor
974 E. Winnerlane Road
Eaton, OH 45320 |
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Buckley, as Parent and Natural Guardian of Brindle Buckley, a minor
974 E. Winnerlane Road
Eaton, OH 45320 |
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Buckley, as Parent and Natural Guardian of Bronson Buckley, a minor
974 E. Winnerlane Road
Eaton, OH 45320 |
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Buckley, as Parent and Natural Guardian of Brooklyn Buckley, a minor
974 E. Winnerlane Road
Eaton, OH 45320 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2)
Mon 04/22 4:17 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Westfield Insurance Co.. (Spille, Timothy) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/22 4:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Westfield Insurance Co., American Select Ins. Co. identifying Corporate Parent American Select Ins. Co. for Westfield Insurance Co... (Spille, Timothy) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Mon 04/22 3:50 PM
ANSWER to6 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Robert Anderson filed by Westfield Insurance Co.. (Spille, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2)
Wed 04/10 1:16 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendants Robert Anderson, Tweedy Transport, Inc.. (Bray, Daniel) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 11:56 AM
(Copy of) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Robert Anderson, Tweedy Transport, Inc., Westfield Insurance Co., and Medical Mutual of Ohio., filed by Plaintiff's. (Originally filed in Common Pleas court of Preble County, Ohio General Division, under case number 24CV032928 on March 5, 2024.) (srb) Modified on 4/10/2024 to restrict document due to names of minors listed PER MJN Chambers (srb) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 9:26 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY AND ORDER - This matter is before the Court upon a sua sponte review for compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). None of the parties have filed a diversity disclosure statement as required by that Rule. Each party is therefore ORDERED to file such a statement no later than thirty days from the date of this Order. A sample "Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement" is available on the Court's website. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 4/10/2024. (acw)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/09 5:46 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Robert Anderson. (Bray, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/09 5:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Tweedy Transport, Inc.. (Bray, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/09 5:35 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tweedy Transport, Inc.. (Bray, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 04/09 5:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Preble County Court of Common Pleas, case number 24CV032928 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9911467), filed by Robert Anderson, Tweedy Transport, Inc.. (Bray, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings |