BATES et al v. MAYORKAS et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William L Campbell, Jr |
Referred: | Barbara D Holmes |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00038 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 30, 2024 |
Case in other court: | District of Columbia, 1:23-cv-03746 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 7:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
Merrick B. Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Honorable Alejandro N. Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MITCHELL BRIAN BATES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NOEMI P. DAGAMI
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 04/30 10:39 AM
ORDER: The parties have filed a Joint Stipulation for Dismissal (Doc. No.18 ) stating that they stipulate to dismiss this action, without prejudice, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Accordingly, pursuant to the parties joint stipulation, this action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close the file. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/30/2024. (am) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 04/29 1:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas. (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Thu 04/25 8:52 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon admitted to this court . (am) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/24 7:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedes C. Maynor-Faulcon on behalf of Merrick B. Garland, Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas (Maynor-Faulcon, Mercedes) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 04/19 11:54 AM
ORDER: The initial case management conference presently set for July 23, 2024 is CANCELLED. A scheduling conference SHALL BE HELD telephonically on June 12, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. (CDT) using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Additionally, Plaintiffs' counsel is reminded that he must file a motion for pro hac vice admission and retain local co-counsel as required by Local Rule 82.01(d)(1) by no later than April 30, 2024. Defendants are reminded of the direction in the March 25, 2024 transfer order from the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia (the "March 25 transfer order") to file an answer within 21 days of the date on which this case was docketed in this district, which was April 8, 2024. Further, the Clerk is directed to TERMINATE the motion to transfer case (Docket No.9 ) as a pending motion, as that motion was resolved by the March 25 transfer order. (Docket No.10 .) It is SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 4/19/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (am) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Tue 04/09 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/23/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Tue 04/09 1:45 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Tue 04/09 1:45 PM
***DISREGARD***NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement., NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) Modified on 4/9/2024 (mg). |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Tue 04/09 1:44 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 04/09 1:55 PM
IL State Bar status verified as active for Sadaf F. Ahmed not admitted to this court - Local counsel required . (mg) |
||
misc
Annotation - PHV
Tue 04/09 1:55 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Sadaf F. Ahmed: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/30/2024. (mg) |
||
misc
Annotation - Local Counsel
Tue 04/09 1:56 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Sadaf F. Ahmed: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 4/30/2024. (mg) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 04/09 1:42 PM
Case transferred in from the District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:23-cv-03746. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' consent motion to transfer and for extension of time, Dkt. 9, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this case be TRANSFERRED to the District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). It is further ORDERED that Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is extended through, and including, 21 days after this action is docketed in the transferee district. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/25/24. (lcrdm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | |
9 | 9 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case and Extend and Memorandum in Support Thereof by MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS.(Adebonojo, Kenneth). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to on 3/25/2024 (zjm). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Set/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 4/4/2024. (zglw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of MERRICK B. GARLAND, UR M. JADDOU, ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS (Adebonojo, Kenneth) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | |
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 2/2/2024; ALEJANDRO N. MAYORKAS served on 2/2/2024 (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | |
6 | 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/05/2024. (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | |
5 | 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/23/2024. (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | |
Sunday, February 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sadaf F. Ahmed on behalf of MITCHELL BRIAN BATES, NOEMI P. DAGAMI Substituting for attorney Brian J. Kholodovsky (Ahmed, Sadaf) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | |
Tuesday, December 26, 2023 | ||
3 | 3 STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/26/23. (lcrdm2) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | |
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsl) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | ||
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10563999) filed by MITCHELL B BATES, NOEMI P DAGAMI.(Kholodovsky, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 4/9/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet |