Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:24-mj-02668
Case Filed:Apr 08, 2024
Terminated:Apr 08, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 3:29 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Noticing AUSA CR TP/SR
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Demetrio Calvillo-Hernandez (1)
Terminated: 04/08/2024
Represented By
Peter S. Heller
Law Offices Of Peter S. Heller, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/10/2024 3:56 AM EDT
Monday, April 08, 2024
1 1 Magistrate Judge Removal of Arrest Warrant and Indictment from WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS (SAN ANTONIO DIVISION) Case number in the other District SA-13-CR-0231-FB(01) as to Demetrio Calvillo-Hernandez (1). (at)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Demetrio Calvillo-Hernandez. (at)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Unseal Case as to Demetrio Calvillo-Hernandez (1). (Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/8/2024). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter S. Heller appearing for Demetrio Calvillo-Hernandez (at)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Order for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Proceedings as to Demetrio Calvillo-Hernandez held on 4/8/2024. Date of Arrest or Surrender: 4/5/2024. Motion to Unseal GRANTED. Defendant WAIVES Removal and STIPULATES TO Pretrial Detention, with the right to revisit in the WD/TX. NO HEARING HELD. Defendant Ordered removed to the WD/TEXAS. Spanish Interpreter present. Attorney added: Peter S. Heller for Demetrio Calvillo-Hernandez (Digital 13:38:46) (Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/8/2024). (at)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER OF REMOVAL HEARING by Demetrio Calvillo-Hernandez (at)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Demetrio Calvillo-Hernandez. Defendant committed to WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. Closing Case for Defendant. (Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/8/2024). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]
8 8 10 pgs Notice of Criminal Transfer to WESTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Demetrio Calvillo-Hernandez. Your case number is: SA-13-CR-0231-FB-01. Docket sheet and documents attached. If you require certified copies of any documents, please call our Records Section at 305-523-5210. Attention Receiving Court : If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to TXND at: InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (at)
Related: [-]