Alicia Pufahl v. Martin O'Malley
Original Case: 2:23-cv-00612
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01545 |
Type | civil / us / social security |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Case Filed: | Apr 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
MARTIN J. O'MALLEY, Commissioner of Social Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALICIA RAE PUFAHL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/10/2024 3:16 AM CDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Alicia Rae Pufahl by 04/15/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 04/22/2024. Appellant's brief due on or before 05/20/2024 for Alicia Rae Pufahl [1] [7375000] 24-1545 (AP) [Entered: 04/09/2024 11:03 AM] | |
Att: 1 76 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |