Linda Brejwo v. Yvonne Kincaid
Original Case: 2:23-cv-00121
Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv.pr-01296 |
Type | civil private / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 4:20 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
YVONNE KINCAID
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
LINDA BREJWO
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/10/2024 4:15 AM EDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:23-cv-00121. Case manager: RachelPhillips. [1001549711] 24-1296 RP [Entered: 04/09/2024 10:07 AM] | |
2 | 2 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Yvonne Kincaid and Linda Brejwo. [1001549713] Informal Opening Brief due 05/03/2024. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 24-1296 RP [Entered: 04/09/2024 10:10 AM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001549720]. Due: 04/23/2024. 24-1296 RP [Entered: 04/09/2024 10:14 AM] |