Deborah Brumit, et al v. City of Granite City, Illinois
Original Case: 3:19-cv-01090
Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-01555 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
GRANITE CITY, ILLINOIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DEBORAH BRUMIT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ANDREW SIMPSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/11/2024 4:03 AM CDT |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Deborah Brumit and Andrew Simpson by 04/15/2024. Appellants' brief due on or before 05/20/2024 for Deborah Brumit and Andrew Simpson. Transcript information sheet due by 04/23/2024. [1] [7375011] 24-1555 (CG) [Entered: 04/09/2024 11:36 AM] | |
Att: 1 20 pgs Civil Case | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court |