Perez v. O'Malley
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02145 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Thu 04/11 5:40 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 04/11 2:42 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fidel Rodriguez Perez.. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
5 | 5
order
Social Security Procedural Order
Thu 04/11 11:19 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 10:23 AM
ORDER granting 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis . Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 4/11/2024. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 04/10 3:05 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/24/2024. (sec, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 1:40 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Fidel Rodriguez Perez. (Benavides, Francesco) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 1:39 AM
COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley. Filed by Fidel Rodriguez Perez.(Benavides, Francesco) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |