Sanchez v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Charlene Edwards Honeywel |
Referred: | Anthony E Porcelli |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00878 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 11:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
I.C. System, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Eliott Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Fri 04/12 10:05 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Eliott Sanchez. Related case(s): No (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 04/12 10:03 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Eliott Sanchez. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 04/12 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Octavio Gomez on behalf of Eliott Sanchez. Lead Counsel: Octavio Gomez. (Gomez, Octavio) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Wed 04/10 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (LV) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Wed 04/10 2:34 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, I.C. System, Inc. (EVK) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Wed 04/10 11:53 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Frank H. Kerney, III and Octavio Gomez of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (AJS) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/10 11:49 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:24-cv-878-CEH-AEP. (AJS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 8:53 AM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, I.C. System, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21965394) filed by Eliott Sanchez.(Gomez, Octavio) Modified to edit docket text on 4/10/2024 (EVK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons EQ, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons IC |