Mitko v. The Home Depot Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip M Halpern |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02699 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 11:09 AM EDT |
ADR Provider
Barbara Mitko
|
|
ADR Provider
The Home Depot, Inc.
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/26 4:20 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831. Initial Conference set for 5/20/2024 at 12:00 PM before Judge Philip M. Halpern. (jca) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 12:28 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/12 12:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 12:29 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 04/11 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK, County of PUTNAM. Case Number: 500999/2023..Document filed by The Home Depot, Inc...(Graves, Yelena) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit S&C, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit AOS, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit ANSWER, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3017 RESPONSE | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 04/11 9:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yelena Graves. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: The Home Depot, Inc, Barbara Mitko, John Doe Corp. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Thu 04/11 10:06 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Yelena Graves to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; Enter which STATE COURT when prompted in ECF. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 4/16/2024. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Thu 04/11 10:12 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yelena Graves. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $3000000000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 3,000,000; the County code has been modified to Dutchess. (vf) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service Other
Wed 04/10 12:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Certificate of Service served on Dennis Kenny LAW on 4/10/2024. Document filed by The Home Depot, Inc...(Graves, Yelena) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Jury Demand
Wed 04/10 11:15 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by The Home Depot, Inc..(Graves, Yelena) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 11:14 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HOME DEPOT U.S.A,. INC for The Home Depot, Inc.. Document filed by The Home Depot, Inc...(Graves, Yelena) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 11:10 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Graves, Yelena) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME COURT OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK COUNTY OF NASSAU, County of PUTNAM. Case Number: 500999/2023. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29198926).Document filed by The Home Depot, Inc...(Graves, Yelena) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit S&C, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit AOS, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit ANSWER, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3017 RESPONSE |