Kisacky v. O'Malley
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Daniel J Stewart |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00493 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Apr 09, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent / Declination Form
Fri 04/19 12:34 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Rana Kisacky advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Gorton, Peter) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/16 8:28 AM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/15/2024.(gmd) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Fri 04/12 9:40 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Geoffrey M. Peters appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 7/11/2024. (Peters, Geoffrey) |
|
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Fri 04/12 9:25 AM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re1 Complaint - Social Security Appeal, Original image has been replaced in its entirety as it contained an erroneously filed cover page not pertaining to this case. Service has been regenerated on the SSAOGC. (egr) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form
Wed 04/10 8:48 AM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12 . Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 5/1/2024. (egr) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 8:46 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rana Kisacky (egr) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED]
Wed 04/10 8:45 AM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (egr) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Wed 04/10 8:44 AM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(egr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Assignment of Attorneys Fees, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |