7
|
|
7
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing
Sat 04/13 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 04/13 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
court
Copy of Required Photo Identification for Filer
Thu 04/11 8:19 AM
Copy of Required Photo Identification pursuant to Administrative Order No. 653 for Filer Singh, Phagoo (dmp)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
trustee
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee
Wed 04/10 11:19 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/13/2024 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-0538, Participant Code 4551117, Enter # sign. (Yang, Stan)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
court
Deficient Filing Chapter 11
Wed 04/10 9:31 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 4/10/2024.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/10/2024. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/10/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/10/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/10/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/10/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 4/24/2024. Schedule A/B due 4/24/2024. Schedule D due 4/24/2024. Schedule E/F due 4/24/2024. Schedule G due 4/24/2024. Schedule H due 4/24/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 4/24/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 4/24/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 4/24/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 4/24/2024. (dmp)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
8
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 04/10 9:16 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Nassau Pro Inc Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/8/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 8/8/2024. (dmp)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto
Wed 04/10 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00. Receipt Number 10333297. (DM) (admin)
Related: [-]
|