Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Charles P Kocoras
Case #: 1:24-cv-02883
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:Aug 15, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 3:30 AM CDT
Defendant
WangJian1978
Defendant
dududianpu
Defendant
chongqingchangtaoruanjianyouxiangongsi
Defendant
caiyuangungunfa
Defendant
Zong shu wan
Defendant
YANIA
Defendant
Xueifjiee Shop
Defendant
XIAOxing
Defendant
WoodDesignWorkshopTR
Defendant
WhatTheTrendsDo
Defendant
WhaleS
Defendant
WangLa
Defendant
duminrunshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
Taojiang Stationery Store in Yiling District, Yichang City (sole proprietorship)
Defendant
Soleigifts
Defendant
SZXZYGS
Defendant
SMALLJQR
Defendant
SASWallDesigner
Defendant
RugShopBoutique
Defendant
Roblox
Defendant
RStarlight
Defendant
RJY
Defendant
QinYunQiu
Defendant
toptrendSVG
Defendant
Christian Faeste
Defendant
zionHomeStore
Defendant
zhouzhixiangshop
Defendant
zhouhaobaihuodian
Defendant
yunchengshiyanhuquruihaokeshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
yunchengshicefengshangmaojingyingbu
Defendant
xkjafgqfazfwgp
Defendant
xinxiaoning
Defendant
xgzyhappy
Defendant
whyhelloprints
Defendant
wangfeiyangde
Defendant
QZBON CE Co.ltd
Defendant
taiyuanshiyinghongshangmaoyouxiangongsi
Defendant
smileh
Defendant
peckercraft
Defendant
ozelhediyecim
Defendant
lets1design
Defendant
leiyijiangbaihuoshanghang
Defendant
kangyangfuyu
Defendant
guangzhoutinggangshangmaoyouxiangongs
Defendant
guangzhoufengyoushangmaoyouxiangongs
Defendant
gizemgencco
Defendant
DUCSANG
Defendant
HolaDesignbyN
Defendant
HONEY BABY KIDS
Defendant
GuChengXianHuaDuoShangMaoYouXianGongSi
Defendant
GoodLuck97
Defendant
GloballyConnected
Defendant
FAMILIO ING
Defendant
Daye Wenmaotai Trading Co., Ltd.
Defendant
DailyCreativa
Defendant
Hoodoo
Defendant
DJShopSG
Defendant
Ciosticker
Defendant
Chef's Magic Plates
Defendant
ChaoV-UK
Defendant
CaoXianHeTaiMuZhiPin
Defendant
CGDigitalDesign
Defendant
CANICCO
Defendant
ByBellaArtShop
Defendant
Atlas3dCraft
Defendant
The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Defendant
LimGood
Defendant
Pnfly
Defendant
Plushiesanime
Defendant
Phoenix Party
Defendant
Pattern94
Defendant
PLUSTYLEdesignShop
Defendant
OzersDecorShop
Defendant
OZBProducts
Defendant
My Honey Baby
Defendant
MULECLOS
Defendant
LutfiDigital
Defendant
Houqt
Defendant
Libiao AMZ
Defendant
Lanliyun Outlet
Defendant
LUCKY DAISY
Defendant
LSTSD TXLS
Defendant
Kunming Noyige E-Commerce Co., Ltd.
Defendant
KidzInvitationArt
Defendant
KiddoRug
Defendant
Keng
Defendant
JQRLGSKD
Defendant
JIANrong
Plaintiff
Roblox Corporation
Represented By
Robert Payton Mcmurray
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info
John Wilson
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info
William Benjamin Kalbac
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info
Michael A. Hierl
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Fjellsniken
Terminated: 08/08/2024
Defendant
Diginvitation
Terminated: 08/01/2024


Docket last updated: 04/10/2024 11:40 AM CDT
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
1 1 18 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Roblox Corporation; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-21839143.(Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 29 pgs Exhibit 2
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roblox Corporation by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roblox Corporation by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roblox Corporation by Robert Payton Mcmurray (Mcmurray, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roblox Corporation by John Wilson (Wilson, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Roblox Corporation to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Roblox Corporation Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Roblox Corporation (Hierl, Michael)
Related: [-]