HIGH FLOW FUNDING, LLC v. ARLINGTON PARTNERS, INC. et al
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Kim R Gibson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00076 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 12:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
ARLINGTON PARTNERS, INC.
9 HARBOR POINT DRIVE
NORTHPORT, NY 11768 |
|
Defendant
HANK WERNER
9 Harbor Point Drive
Northport, NY 11768 |
|
Plaintiff
HIGH FLOW FUNDING, LLC
615 Howard Ave Suite 201
Altoona, PA 16601 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Tue 04/30 3:46 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by HIGH FLOW FUNDING, LLC. HANK WERNER served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (Saksen, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed
Tue 04/30 3:44 PM
SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by HIGH FLOW FUNDING, LLC. ARLINGTON PARTNERS, INC. served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (Saksen, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
adr
Notice of ADR Designation
Thu 04/11 11:18 AM
NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (krh) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Wed 04/10 4:44 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by HIGH FLOW FUNDING, LLC. (Saksen, Alexander) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 4:27 PM
Summons Issued as to HANK WERNER (jkn) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Wed 04/10 4:27 PM
Summons Issued as to ARLINGTON PARTNERS, INC. (jkn) |
|
5 | 5
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Wed 04/10 2:29 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by HIGH FLOW FUNDING, LLC (Saksen, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Arlington, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Werner | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Wed 04/10 2:13 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by HIGH FLOW FUNDING, LLC. (Saksen, Alexander) |
|
3 | 3
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Wed 04/10 12:05 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by HIGH FLOW FUNDING, LLC (Saksen, Alexander) |
|
2 | 2
service
Praecipe to Issue Summons
Wed 04/10 12:04 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by HIGH FLOW FUNDING, LLC (Saksen, Alexander) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Wed 04/10 11:36 AM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8208272), filed by HIGH FLOW FUNDING, LLC. (Saksen, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Q | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 04/10 1:24 PM
Judge Kim R. Gibson added. (jkn) |
||
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 1:26 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Plaintiff did not file disclosure statement identifying both all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public AND citizenship as required pursuant to both LR 7.1.A and FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2024. (jkn) |
||
misc
QC - Praecipe to Issue Summons
Wed 04/10 1:28 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re3 Praecipe to Issue Summons,2 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: The summonses were filed as the main document. CORRECTION: Attorney to refile the document with a Praecipe to Issue Summons as the main document and the properly filled out summonses as attachments to the Praecipe, using the Praecipe to Issue Summons event. (jkn) |
||
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 4:06 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re4 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying CITIZENSHIP as required pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2024. (jkn) |