Jane Street Group, LLC v. Millennium Management LLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edgardo Ramos |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00175 |
Cause | M 98 Miscellaneous Application to File Civil Case Under Seal |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Apr 11, 2024 9:39 AM EDT |
ADR Provider
Daniel Spottiswood
|
|
Defendant
Millennium Management LLC
|
|
Defendant
Douglas Schadewald
|
|
Plaintiff
Jane Street Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal
Thu 04/11 5:26 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** ORDER ON MOTION TO FILE REDACTED COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS granting2 Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal. Cases sought to be filed under seal for which permission is granted must not be initiated electronically and must be submitted in the traditional manner, on paper. Please see Section 14.2 of the ECF Rules and Instructions.[LINK:ECF RULES & INSTRUCTIONS] The Clerk is directed to restrict access to this Order to the selected party viewing level. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/11/2024) (jca) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 04/11 1:21 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Deborah K. Brown. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Daniel Spottiswood. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (vba) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/11 1:22 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vba) |
||
notice
Miscellaneous Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/11 1:27 PM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. This is a Part I Term Assignment matter. (vba) |
||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Motion for Leave to File Case Under Seal
Thu 04/11 1:28 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CASE UNDER SEAL. Document No. 2 MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal . was reviewed and approved as to form. (vba) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Leave to File Case Under Seal
Wed 04/10 12:55 PM
***EX-PARTE*** MISCELLANEOUS CASE INITIATING DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to File Case Under Seal .Document filed by Jane Street Group, LLC.(Brown, Deborah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to File Complaint Under Seal, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit /Declaration of Deborah K. Brown in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to File Complaint Under Seal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint to be Filed Under Seal (with Plaintiff's Proposed Redactions), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Redacted Public Version of Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order on Motion to File Redacted Complaint and Exhibits | ||
1 | 1
2
pgs
misc
Miscellaneous Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 12:39 PM
MISCELLANEOUS COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Deborah) |