Doe v. Praxis Housing Initiatives, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Jessica G L Clarke |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02703 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:3604(f)(3)(c) Fair Housing Amendments Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Praxis Housing Initiatives, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Shauntee Garnett
|
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Mon 04/22 12:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Praxis Housing Initiatives, Inc. served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. Service was accepted by Sean Jorgenson. Document filed by John Doe..(Horth, Aaron) |
|
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service Complaints
Mon 04/22 12:51 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Shauntee Garnett served on 4/19/2024, answer due 5/10/2024. Service was accepted by Sean Jorgenson. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by John Doe..(Horth, Aaron) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 3:11 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shauntee Garnett..(jgo) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/18 3:10 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Praxis Housing Initiatives, Inc...(jgo) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/17 12:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shauntee Garnett, re:2 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe..(Horth, Aaron) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/17 12:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Praxis Housing Initiatives, Inc., re:2 Complaint. Document filed by John Doe..(Horth, Aaron) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 04/12 5:36 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Unless and until the Court orders otherwise, counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 25, 2024 at 3:00 p.m. The conference will be held in person. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/25/2024 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 4/12/2024) (vfr) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order Granting IFP Application
Fri 04/12 5:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS (IFP) STATUS: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. See 28 U.S.C. §1915. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jessica G. L. Clarke on 4/12/2024) (vfr) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 12:44 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by John Doe.(vf) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 12:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (vf) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 12:42 PM
COMPLAINT against Praxis Housing Initiatives, Inc., Shauntee Garnett. Document filed by John Doe.(vf) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Sealed Document
Wed 04/10 12:40 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus) |
|
utility
Case Designation
Wed 04/10 12:43 PM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 04/10 12:43 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
misc
Remark
Wed 04/10 12:45 PM
ORDER REDACTING PLEADING FILED IN 24-MC-161. Document filed by John Doe. (vf) |
||
misc
Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
Wed 04/10 4:42 PM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Aaron Horth for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 2 Complaint, 4 Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, 3 Civil Cover Sheet to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (gp) |