Mays et al v. The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Embry J Kidd |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00676 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | In the Circuit Court of the 18th Judicial Circuit, 24-000497 CA |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 2:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Coreen Lloyd-Adams
|
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Mays
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Thu 04/25 6:37 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Matthew J. Lavisky on behalf of The First Liberty Corporation. Lead Counsel: Matthew J. Lavisky. (Lavisky, Matthew) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of appearance
Thu 04/25 6:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Lavisky on behalf of The First Liberty Corporation (Lavisky, Matthew) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/25 6:23 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The First Liberty Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for The First Liberty Corporation.. (Lavisky, Matthew) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Thu 04/25 5:52 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by The First Liberty Corporation. Related case(s): No (Lavisky, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of a Related Action
Tue 04/23 10:56 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Coreen Lloyd-Adams, Anthony Mays. Related case(s): No (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/23 10:42 AM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Coreen Lloyd-Adams, Anthony Mays. (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/22 8:14 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by The First Liberty Corporation.(Lavisky, Matthew) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of appearance
Mon 04/22 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Appearance by Guillermo Lopez Segarra on behalf of Anthony Mays (Lopez Segarra, Guillermo) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/11 10:19 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 4/11/2024. (JOR) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 04/11 7:49 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/11/2024. (MEH) |
|
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/11 7:49 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/11/2024. (MEH) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/10 4:16 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-676-CEM-EJK. (AA) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 18th Judicial Circuit in and for Seminole County, Florida, case number 2024CA000124 filed in State Court on 03/15/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-21967220 filed by The First Liberty Insurance Corporation.(Lavisky, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 State Court Other Documents Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet |