Boyer v. Bluegrass Hospitality Group, LLC
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory F Vantatenhove |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00101 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Bluegrass Hospitality Group, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Lauren Boyer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 04/26 10:24 AM
NOTICE OF FILING by Lauren Boyer NOTICE OF FILING CONSENTS TO JOIN(Richards, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Sue Under Fair Labor Standards Act (Mario Casale), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Consent to Sue Under Fair Labor Standards Act (Angela Houghton) | ||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/24 10:27 AM
ORDER: granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jordan Richards. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 4/24/24. (JLM) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Motion Submitted
Tue 04/23 9:59 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re8 MOTION for Jordan Richards, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Boyer ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5818125) (JLM) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 04/22 10:55 AM
NOTICE OF FILING by Lauren Boyer re8 MOTION for Jordan Richards, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Boyer ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5818125) Notice of Filing Proposed Order Related to Plaintiff's Motion for Jordan Richards, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice(Richards, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 04/22 8:57 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Jordan Richards re8 MOTION for Jordan Richards, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Boyer. Error : attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney; within 7 calendar days , prepare a document entitled "Notice of Filing," file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing," attach the proposed order, and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (STC) |
||
misc
Bar Status Check
Mon 04/22 8:58 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed as to Jordan Lee Richards re8 MOTION for Jordan Richards, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Boyer ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5818125). (STC) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/19 9:20 AM
MOTION for Jordan Richards, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Boyer ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5818125)(Richards, Jordan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - List of Jurisdictions and Certificate of Good Standing for Jordan Richards, Esq. | ||
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 10:33 AM
ORDER: granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for C. Ryan Morgan. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 4/17/24. (JLM) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
misc
Bar Status Check
Thu 04/11 8:41 AM
BAR STATUS Check completed re6 MOTION for C. Ryan Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Boyer ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5812228). (JLM) |
||
utility
Motion Submitted
Thu 04/11 8:41 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Gregory F. Van Tatenhove for review: re6 MOTION for C. Ryan Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Boyer ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5812228) (JLM) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/10 4:59 PM
MOTION for C. Ryan Morgan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lauren Boyer ( Filing fee $125; receipt number AKYEDC-5812228)(Morgan, C.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing | ||
5 | 5
notice
Attorney Notice
Wed 04/10 9:17 AM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY Jordan Richards, Esq by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2(KCF) |
|
Att: 1 LR 83.1 & 83.2 Admission Packet | ||
4 | 4
notice
Attorney Notice
Wed 04/10 9:14 AM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY C. Ryan Morgan, Esq. by Clerk re: L.R. 83 - Attorney Admission procedures w/ a copy of L.R. 83.1 and 83.2(KCF) |
|
Att: 1 LR 83.1 & 83.2 Admission Packet | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued/Reissued
Wed 04/10 9:09 AM
Summons Issued as to Bluegrass Hospitality Group, LLC and returned to counsel electronically for service. (KCF) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 8:54 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5811336), filed by Lauren Boyer.(KCF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Filing Consents to Join, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Bluegrass Hospitality Group, LLC, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Wed 04/10 8:55 AM
Conflict Check run. (KCF) |