Blue Isle Home-Style Restaurant & Bar, LLC et al v. Winchester Country Club
Kentucky Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Danny C Reeves |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00102 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Clark Circuit Court, 24-CI-102 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Winchester Country Club
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blue Isle Home-Style Restaurant & Bar, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rawle Sylvester Somersall, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/17 4:02 PM
VIRTUAL ORDER: granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Winchester Country Club. The time within which the defendant may respond to the Complaint is extended through May 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/17/24. (JLM) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/17 3:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Winchester Country Club(Gold, Sharon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension | ||
6 | 6
notice
Other Notice
Wed 04/17 11:34 AM
NOTICE by Winchester Country Club Notice of Withdrawal (Pack, Ashley) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Other Notice
Wed 04/17 10:59 AM
NOTICE by Winchester Country Club Notice of Withdrawal (Morgan, Donald) |
|
4 | 4
respoth
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 8:57 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Winchester Country Club. (Gold, Sharon) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 04/17 2:46 PM
Attorney Update. Attorney Donald C. Morgan and Ashley L. Pack terminated. (JLM) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1
Wed 04/10 1:00 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Winchester Country Club. (KMP) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 12:57 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-102. ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5811690), filed by Winchester Country Club.(KMP) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Record, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of NOR, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Conflict Check
Wed 04/10 12:58 PM
Conflict Check run. (KMP) |