Washington v. Walmart Inc.
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah S Vance |
Referred: | Donna Phillips Currault |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00892 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 24th JDC, Parish of Jefferson, 843-998 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 1:09 PM CDT |
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juanita Washington
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 04/19 9:31 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure - Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary (gla) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Compliance
Thu 04/18 3:51 PM
Notice of Compliance List of Parties and Pleadings Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1448(B) by Walmart Inc. re1 Notice of Removal,.(Martin, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
4 | 4
misc
Statement of Corporate Disclosure
Thu 04/18 3:45 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Walmart Inc. (Crochet, Quincy) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/11 9:56 AM
DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart Inc. (cs) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 04/10 1:17 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S Vance and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (meb) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th JDC, Parish of Jefferson, case number 843-998 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10478917) filed by Walmart Inc..Attorney Peter Sinnott Martin added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft).(Martin, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D |