Jemison v. McMillen et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas R Cole |
Referred: | Karen L Litkovitz |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00197 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 2:09 PM EDT |
Defendant
Kroger Company
|
|
Defendant
Rodney McMillen
|
|
Defendant
Clay Richards
|
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Elijah Jemison
4005 South Plaza Trail
Virginia Beach, VA 23452 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/25 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT against Kroger Company, Rodney McMillen, and Clay Richards, filed by Dennis Elijah Jemison. (zmc) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/25 10:24 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is ORDERED that plaintiff, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, submit a completed summons form, U.S. Marshal form, and copy of his complaint for service on Rodney McMullen, Kroger Company, and Clay Richards. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 4/24/2024. (zmc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/22 3:21 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Dennis Elijah Jemison. (zmc) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Deficiency (Clerk's Notice)
Wed 04/10 4:03 PM
Notice of Deficiency re: The required civil cover sheet was not included in the filing. Related Document:1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dennis Elijah Jemison. Deficiency Deadline by 5/10/2024. (zmc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 3:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dennis Elijah Jemison. (zmc) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |