46 Exeter, LLC v. Nautilus Insurance Company et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | John J Mcconnell, Jr |
Referred: | Lincoln D Almond |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00141 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Washington County Superior Court, WC-24-00125 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 2:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
Nautilus Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Penn-America Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
46 Exeter, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Robinson on behalf of Nautilus Insurance Company (Robinson, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/18 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Clark W. Yudysky on behalf of Nautilus Insurance Company (Yudysky, Clark) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/17 2:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Nautilus Insurance Company.(Yudysky, Clark) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/15 3:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Penn-America Insurance Company.(Scavone, Luana) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
State Court Record
Wed 04/10 2:25 PM
STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
|
Att: 1 Index | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 11:36 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penn-America Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Global Indemnity Group, LLC for Penn-America Insurance Company.. (Scavone, Luana) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Case Opening Notice (Form Attached)
Wed 04/10 11:19 AM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon P. Ruggieri on behalf of Penn-America Insurance Company (Ruggieri, Brandon) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/10 11:04 AM
NOTICE by Penn-America Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal - New Case, Defendant, Penn-America Insurance Company's Notice of Consent to Removal (Scavone, Luana) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luana DiSarra Scavone on behalf of Penn-America Insurance Company (Scavone, Luana) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal - New Case
Wed 04/10 10:54 AM
NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2024-0125. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ARIDC-1982443, filed by Penn-America Insurance Company.(Scavone, Luana) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summonses, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Proofs of Service, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Docket | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/10 11:19 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hill, Cherelle) |