Horn v. Peterson et al
Arkansas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan O Hickey |
Referred: | Mark E Ford |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-06049 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/09 11:10 AM
MOTION for Subpoenas by Dustin Lemuel Horn. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tmc) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Compel
Mon 05/06 1:16 PM
MOTION to Compel by Dustin Lemuel Horn. Motions referred to Mark E. Ford.(tmc) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
utility
Memo of Reassignment
Fri 05/03 10:43 AM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Mark E. Ford. Honorable Barry A Bryant no longer assigned to the case. (hnc) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983) ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 04/24 1:51 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983); Plaintiff is DIRECTED to pay the $350 filing fee and $55 administrative fee, a total of $405 by May 14, 2024. Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 24, 2024. (tmc) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee
Wed 04/24 1:56 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee:1 Complaint Referred (42:1983). You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 If the proper fees are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal. Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office. Filing Fee due by 5/14/2024 (tmc) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form
Wed 04/10 1:07 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tmc) |
|
3 | 3
1
pgs
order
Order - PC Complaint 42:1983 - Initial
Wed 04/10 1:05 PM
ORDER directing the Clerk to file the in forma pauperis (IFP) application and complaint submitted by the Plaintiff. A determination regarding his status as a pauper and service of process will be made at a later time. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of his new address . Signed by Honorable Barry A Bryant on April 10, 2024. (tmc) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis (42:1983)
Wed 04/10 1:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Dustin Lemuel Horn. Motions referred to Barry A Bryant.(tmc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Referred (42:1983)
Wed 04/10 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Anderson, Martin, and Peterson, filed by Dustin Lemuel Horn.(tmc) |