Fisher v. Kirkland's Stores, Inc. et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Gary A Fenner |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00258 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court of Jackson County at Independence, 2416-CV05977 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 2:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Amy Camerlynck
|
|
Defendant
Kirkland's Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Kay Fisher
|
Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply Suggestions to Motion
Wed 05/01 8:42 AM
REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re4 MOTION to remand filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Plaintiff Linda Kay Fisher. (Rhodes, Randall) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of MAPN
Mon 04/29 4:22 PM
AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category I. (Crocker, Susan) (Crocker, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 (4/29/2024) MAP General Order | ||
15 | 15
respm
Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/29 4:00 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re4 MOTION to remand filed by Amanda Pennington Ketchum on behalf of Defendant Kirkland's Stores, Inc.. Reply suggestions due by 5/13/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Pennington Ketchum, Amanda) |
|
14 | 14
discov
Notice to Take Deposition
Mon 04/29 10:01 AM
NOTICE to take deposition of Kirkland's Stores Inc. filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Plaintiff Linda Kay Fisher.(Rhodes, Randall) |
|
13 | 13
discov
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/29 9:59 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Linda Kay Fisher filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Plaintiff Linda Kay Fisher.(Rhodes, Randall) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Fri 04/26 2:05 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Lauren Hope Beck on behalf of Defendant Kirkland's Stores, Inc..(Beck, Lauren) |
|
11 | 11
discov
Certificate of service of initial Rule 26 disclosures
Fri 04/26 10:00 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Plaintiff Linda Kay Fisher.(Rhodes, Randall) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/24 2:34 PM
Consent MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to4 MOTION to remand filed by Lauren Hope Beck on behalf of Amy Camerlynck, Kirkland's Stores, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/8/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Beck, Lauren) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/19 3:16 PM
SUGGESTIONS in opposition re7 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Plaintiff Linda Kay Fisher. Reply suggestions due by 5/3/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhodes, Randall) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Suggestions in Support of Motion
Wed 04/17 1:42 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re7 MOTION to dismiss party filed by Lauren Hope Beck on behalf of Defendant Amy Camerlynck. (Beck, Lauren) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Party
Wed 04/17 1:40 PM
MOTION to dismiss party filed by Lauren Hope Beck on behalf of Amy Camerlynck. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/1/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Beck, Lauren) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/17 1:33 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Kirkland's Stores, Inc..(Beck, Lauren) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Suggestions in Support of Motion
Thu 04/11 1:37 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re4 MOTION to remand filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Plaintiff Linda Kay Fisher. (Rhodes, Randall) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Remand
Thu 04/11 1:36 PM
MOTION to remand filed by Randall L. Rhodes on behalf of Linda Kay Fisher. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/25/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rhodes, Randall) |
|
3 | 3
order
Rule 16 Notice
Thu 04/11 9:31 AM
RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/26/2024. Rule 26 conference due by 5/16/2024. Signed on 4/11/24 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of MAPJ
Wed 04/10 2:23 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts.(Woods, Gloria) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 2:00 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2416-CV05977, filed by Lauren Hope Beck. Filing fee $405, receipt number AMOWDC-8953431.(Beck, Lauren) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |