Humphrey v. Missouri State Highway Patrol
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Willie J Epps, Jr |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04054 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:24-cv-10325 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 2:11 PM CDT |
Defendant
Missouri State Highway Patrol
|
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Edward Humphrey
12 Summer Street Apartment 2
Boston, MA 02129 |
GPO
Apr 10 2024
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION entered. (PSSA, 5) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/10/2024) (PSSA, 5). [Transferred from mad on 4/10/2024.] |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment
Thu 05/02 8:54 AM
SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 5/9/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF and instructions mailed to Thomas Edward Humphrey, 12 Summer Street, Apartment 2, Boston, MA 02129. (Berner, Crystal) |
||
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/30 7:20 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Missouri State Highway Patrol by Thomas Edward Humphrey. Document received via EDSS on 04/29/2024. (Berner, Crystal) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of MAPADMIN
Thu 04/25 11:04 AM
AMENDED NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. NEF and MAP information mailed to Thomas Edward Humphrey, 12 Summer Street, Apartment 2, Boston, MA 02129.(Warren, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Tue 04/23 12:41 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file his Amended Complaint on or before May 1, 2024 unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 4/23/2024 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane) Modified on 4/23/2024 to reflect copy mailed to: Thomas Edward Humphrey, 12 Summer Street, Apartment 2, Boston, MA 02129 (Lock, Tania) |
|
notice
Notice of Docket Modification
Tue 04/23 9:20 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 4/22/2024 as Document No. 14, PRO SE NOTICE of filing by Thomas Edward Humphrey.. The document has been deleted as the incorrect event was used when filing the document. The document was refiled using the correct event in docket entry #15. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Kern, Kendra) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Leave to File Document
Tue 04/23 9:16 AM
PRO SE MOTION for leave to file filed by Thomas Edward Humphrey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/6/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. #3 Envelope). (Kern, Kendra) |
|
Att: 1 Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 04/22 3:43 PM
PRO SE NOTICE of filing by Thomas Edward Humphrey.(Kern, Kendra) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 04/22 8:12 AM
NOTICE of filing declination of mediation and assessment program and demand for jury trial filed by Thomas Edward Humphrey re11 Notice of MAPN- CATEGORY II, (Warren, Melissa) Modified on 4/22/2024 to reflect NEF mailed to Thomas Edward Humphrey, 12 Summer Street, Apartment 2, Boston, MA 02129 (Warren, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Notice of Pretrial Procedure
Wed 04/10 2:24 PM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 4/10/2024 by Chief Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (McIntosh, Michal-Ane) Modified on 4/10/2024 to reflect copy mailed to: Thomas Edward Humphrey, 12 Summer Street, Apartment 2, Boston, MA 02129. (Berner, Crystal) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of MAPNII
Wed 04/10 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to outside neutral category II. NEF, Notice and Order mailed to Thomas Edward Humphrey, 12 Summer Street, Apartment 2, Boston, MA 02129.(Warren, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Wed 04/10 11:13 AM
CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:24-cv-10325. Modified on 4/10/2024 to reflect NEF mailed to Thomas Edward Humphrey, 12 Summer Street, Apartment 2, Boston, MA 02129 (Warren, Melissa) |
|
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Wed 04/10 10:13 AM
Case transferred to the Western District of Missouri. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to Clerk in that district. (Kelly, Danielle) |
|
8 | 8
utility
Staff Notes (non-public)
Wed 04/10 10:02 AM
Copy of ECF# 7 mailed to Thomas Edward Humphrey Apartment 2 12 Summer Street Boston, MA 02129 on 4-10-24. (Castilla, Francis) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/10 8:00 AM
Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION entered. (PSSA, 5) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/10/2024) (PSSA, 5) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment
Wed 04/10 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click[LINK:here] for instructions. Form due by 5/1/2024 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF and instructions mailed to Thomas Edward Humphrey, 12 Summer Street, Apartment 2Boston, MA 02129. (Warren, Melissa) |
||
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
6 | 6 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause by Thomas Edward Humphrey.(Kelly, Danielle) [Transferred from mad on 4/10/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and show cause order. Response due: 3/18/2024. (PSSA, 5) [Transferred from mad on 4/10/2024.] | |
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Cook, Savannah) [Transferred from mad on 4/10/2024.] | |
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 EXHIBIT re1 Complaint by Thomas Edward Humphrey. (Phillips, Sophie) [Transferred from mad on 4/10/2024.] | |
2 | 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Edward Humphrey.(Phillips, Sophie) [Transferred from mad on 4/10/2024.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Missouri State Highway Patrol, filed by Thomas Edward Humphrey.(Phillips, Sophie) [Transferred from mad on 4/10/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Category Form, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |