Prince v. Jason D. Boroff & Associates, PLLC et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Referred: | Gary Stein |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02706 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 3:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Boston Tremont Housing Development Fund Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Enrique Diaz
|
|
Defendant
Jason D. Boroff & Associates, PLLC
|
|
Defendant
Emmanuel Lanzot
|
|
Defendant
Phipps Houses Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Process Server Plus, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Maritza Prince
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/16 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Genesis Miranda on behalf of Maritza Prince..(Miranda, Genesis) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Redesignation
Mon 04/15 1:20 PM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is so redesignated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (vba) |
||
notice
Notice of Reassignment of Referral to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/15 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gary Stein, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang no longer referred to the case. (vba) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/12 9:28 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/11/24) (yv) |
|
15 | 15
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/11 12:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Boston Tremont Housing Development Fund Corporation, Enrique Diaz, Jason D. Boroff & Associates, PLLC, Emmanuel Lanzot, Phipps Houses Services, Inc., Process Server Plus, Inc.. Document filed by Maritza Prince..(Ranucci, Jessica) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 12:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Process Server Plus, Inc.. (vf) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 12:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Phipps Houses Services, Inc.. (vf) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 12:34 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Enrique Diaz. (vf) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 12:33 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Emmanuel Lanzot. (vf) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 12:32 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Tremont Housing Development Fund Corporation. (vf) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 12:31 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason D. Boroff & Associates, PLLC. (vf) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Thu 04/11 12:21 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jessica Grace Ranucci to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Signature Error. The Signature of the ECF Filing Attorney User is not provided. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/11 12:23 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/11 12:23 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/11 12:24 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 2:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PROCESS SERVER PLUS, INC., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritza Prince..(Ranucci, Jessica) |
|
7 | 7
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 2:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHIPPS HOUSES SERVICES, INC., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritza Prince..(Ranucci, Jessica) |
|
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 2:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ENRIQUE DIAZ, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritza Prince..(Ranucci, Jessica) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 2:23 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EMMANUEL LANZOT, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritza Prince..(Ranucci, Jessica) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 2:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BOSTON TREMONT HOUSING DEVELOPMENT FUND CORPORATION, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritza Prince..(Ranucci, Jessica) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 2:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JASON D. BOROFF & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Maritza Prince..(Ranucci, Jessica) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 2:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ranucci, Jessica) |
|
1 | 1
56
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Boston Tremont Housing Development Fund Corporation, Enrique Diaz, Jason D. Boroff & Associates, PLLC, Emmanuel Lanzot, Phipps Houses Services, Inc., Process Server Plus, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29200657)Document filed by Maritza Prince..(Ranucci, Jessica) |