Velez et al v. MedRite LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gregory H Woods |
Referred: | Sarah Netburn |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02707 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:021 |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 3:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
MedRite LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Gabriel Velez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gilbert Velez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago |
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/15 3:28 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) and All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/15/2024) (rro) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 9:20 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MedRite LLC..(jgo) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/11 9:18 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 04/11 9:19 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/11 9:20 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 04/10 2:33 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MedRite LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gabriel Velez, Gilbert Velez..(Benharris, Hunter) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/10 2:30 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hunter G Benharris on behalf of Gabriel Velez, Gilbert Velez..(Benharris, Hunter) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 2:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Schaffer, Brian) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 2:18 PM
COMPLAINT against MedRite LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29200724)Document filed by Gabriel Velez, Gilbert Velez..(Schaffer, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pay Data, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit FLSA Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit FLSA Consent Form |