Miller v. ZeroFox Holdings, Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Lewis A Kaplan |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02711 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Terminated: | Apr 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
James C. Foster
|
|
Defendant
Adam Gerchen
|
|
Defendant
Todd P. Headley
|
|
Defendant
Paul Hooper
|
|
Defendant
Thomas F. Kelly
|
|
Defendant
Samskriti King
|
|
Defendant
Theresa H. Shea
|
|
Defendant
Barbara Stewart
|
|
Defendant
ZeroFox Holdings, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Eric Miller
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/28/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Case Accepted as Related
Tue 04/23 11:24 AM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-02457-LAK-GS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) |
||
notice
Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
Tue 04/23 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 04/23 11:31 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba) |
||
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 04/22 2:40 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, and without costs against the defendant(s) James C. Foster, Adam Gerchen, Todd P. Headley, Paul Hooper, Thomas F. Kelly, Samskriti King, Teresa H. Shea, Barbara Stewart, ZeroFox Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Eric Miller. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Acocelli, Richard) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Thu 04/11 10:47 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 04/11 10:48 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar
Thu 04/11 10:48 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lewis A. Kaplan as possibly related to 24-cv-2457. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Thu 04/11 10:49 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Richard Adam Acocelli, Jr. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Theresa H. Shea. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement of Relatedness
Wed 04/10 2:35 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 24-cv-02457. Document filed by Eric Miller..(Acocelli, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 2:33 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Acocelli, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 2:32 PM
COMPLAINT against James C. Foster, Adam Gerchen, Todd P. Headley, Paul Hooper, Thomas F. Kelly, Samskriti King, Theresa H. Shea, Barbara Stewart, ZeroFox Holdings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29200990)Document filed by Eric Miller..(Acocelli, Richard) |