LOAD DELIVERED LOGISTICS, LLC d/b/a CAPSTONE LOGISTICS v. Freight Direct LLC d/b/a Go Forward et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-02709 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 3:12 PM EDT |
Defendant
Freight Direct LLC d/b/a Go Forward
|
|
Defendant
Lipa Krausz
|
|
Plaintiff
LOAD DELIVERED LOGISTICS, LLC d/b/a CAPSTONE LOGISTICS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment - Consent
Tue 04/16 5:03 PM
CONSENT JUDGMENT. Defendants have authorized any attorney designated by Plaintiff to appear and file this Consent Judgment, jointly, against both Defendants Freight Direct, LLC and Lipa Krausz a/k/a Leo Krausz, in favor of Plaintiff, for the sum of $188,501.93 which constitutes the unpaid portion of the principal balance due and owing to Plaintiff by Freight Direct for 104 of Plaintiff's invoices for services rendered, less amounts paid, either voluntarily or pursuant to the parties' agreement, by Defendants to Plaintiff for such invoices, as further set forthwith in the parties' Settlement Agreement at the time of entry of this Consent Judgment. Defendants irrevocably waive services of process and any challenge to venue or jurisdiction. SO ORDERED AND ENTERED: (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 4/16/24) (yv) Modified on 4/16/2024 (yv) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Judgment
Tue 04/16 9:40 AM
PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document filed by Load Delivered Logistics, LLC..(Steinberg, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement | ||
misc
Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
Tue 04/16 10:50 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. 6 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (tp) |
||
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 10:00 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Steinberg, Rick) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 04/12 9:43 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Rick Aaron Steinberg to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Citizenship Plaintiff and Defendant codes was selected under Citizenship of Principal Parties; multiple Courthouse Assignment codes was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 04/12 9:43 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rick Aaron Steinberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Orange;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 04/12 9:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Rick Aaron Steinberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: LOAD DELIVERED LOGISTICS, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 04/12 9:45 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 04/12 9:47 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 04/12 9:47 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Petition (Other)
Thu 04/11 3:30 PM
PETITION Consent Judgment..Document filed by LOAD DELIVERED LOGISTICS, LLC d/b/a CAPSTONE LOGISTICS..(Steinberg, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit proposed Consent Judgment | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Thu 04/11 9:38 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Rick Aaron Steinberg to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Petition (Other). The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; PDF title error; party roles on the PDF case caption must be listed as Petitioner vs. Respondent; the pleading was not signed by the attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition Other found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 4/16/2024. (jgo) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 3:13 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by LOAD DELIVERED LOGISTICS, LLC d/b/a CAPSTONE LOGISTICS..(Steinberg, Rick) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 04/10 2:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Steinberg, Rick) |
|
1 | 1
3
pgs
cmp
Petition (Other)
Wed 04/10 2:28 PM
PETITION Consent Judgment. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29200901).Document filed by LOAD DELIVERED LOGISTICS, LLC d/b/a CAPSTONE LOGISTICS..(Steinberg, Rick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Forbearance and Settlement Agreement |