FISHER v. CHAMPION TRUCKLINES, LLC et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark A Kearney |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01490 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Re-opened: | Apr 30, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, 231202846 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 3:10 PM EDT |
Defendant
CCA SERVICES, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CHAMPION TRUCKLINES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-4
|
|
Defendant
LOUIS F UCCIFERRI
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RAYONNA FISHER
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/30 4:52 PM
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE HER DISCLOSURES NO LATER THAN 5/3/2024 OR WE MAY CONSIDER SANCTIONS FOR TWICE FAILING TO HONOR OUR ORDERS. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/30/2024. 4/30/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Report Of
Tue 04/30 3:12 PM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by RAYONNA FISHER. (STERNBERG, DAVID) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Fri 04/19 1:04 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CHAMPION TRUCKLINES, LLC, LOUIS F UCCIFERRI.(KAZATSKY, ROBYN) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 04/19 10:32 AM
ORDER IT APPEARING NEITHER PLAINTIFF NOR DEFENDANTS FILED THEIR DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 7.1(A)(2) AT THE TIME OF FILING THEIR FIRST APPEARANCE, IT IS ORDERED THE PARTIES SHALL FILE THEIR DISCLOSURES NO LATER THAN APRIL 24, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/19/2024. 4/19/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 04/19 7:43 AM
ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/2/2024 08:30 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/18/2024. 4/19/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/17 4:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by CHAMPION TRUCKLINES, LLC, LOUIS F UCCIFERRI.(KAZATSKY, ROBYN) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint)
Wed 04/17 4:13 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by CHAMPION TRUCKLINES, LLC, LOUIS F UCCIFERRI. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal (Attorney), .(KAZATSKY, ROBYN) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/17 9:58 AM
ORDERED THAT THE STIPULATION TO DISMISS CCA SERVICES, LLC IS APPROVED. WE DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST CCA SERVICES, LLC ONLY. WE AMEND THE CAPTION AS HEREIN. ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/16/2024. 4/17/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg) |
|
7 | 7
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Tue 04/16 3:39 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, ) |
|
6 | 6
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Tue 04/16 12:52 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CHAMPION TRUCKLINES, LLC.(KAZATSKY, ROBYN) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Tue 04/16 12:43 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss CCA Services, LLC without prejudice by CHAMPION TRUCKLINES, LLC, LOUIS F UCCIFERRI. (KAZATSKY, ROBYN) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Fri 04/12 12:04 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, ) |
|
misc
Remark
Fri 04/12 7:34 AM
Document 3 Mailed to: CCA Services, LLC. (DT) |
||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 04/11 4:02 PM
ORDER THAT BY 4/18/2024 PLAINTIFF MAY STIPULATE TO DISMISS CLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DEFENDANTS MAY STIPULATE TO REMAND, DEFENDANTS MAY FILE AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL OR DEFENDANTDS SHOW CAUSE WHY WE SHOULD NOT REMAND THE COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 4/11/24. 4/11/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREP NOT MAILED. (va) Modified on 4/11/2024 (va) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
adr
Letter re: Arbitration Certification
Wed 04/10 3:12 PM
Letter re: Arbitration Certification(sbt) |
|
Att: 1 Arbitration Certification Form | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Attorney)
Wed 04/10 2:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LOUIS F UCCIFERRI, CHAMPION TRUCKLINES, LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17389309), filed by LOUIS F UCCIFERRI, CHAMPION TRUCKLINES, LLC.(KAZATSKY, ROBYN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form Case Management Track Designation Form, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint |