Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jane J Boyle
Case #: 3:24-cv-00880
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 3:48 AM CDT
Defendant
TGI Friday's Inc
Represented By
Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
Jay Clark Zeleskey
Zeleskey Mediations
contact info
Plaintiff
Telgian Corporation
Represented By
C Charles Townsend
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Bryan Timothy Brown
Hinshaw Culbertson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago
Friday, February 21, 2025
15 15 order Order Fri 02/21 9:58 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: On November 2, 2024, Defendant TGI Friday's, Inc. (the "Debtor"), filed a voluntary petition for relief under Chapter 11 of Title 11 of the United States Code in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Northern District of Texas. See Doc. 14, Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Under 11 U.S.C. section 362(a)(1), Debtor's bankruptcy filings operate as an automatic stay. Thus, all claims in this action brought against Debtor are stayed. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 2/21/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/16 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings filed by TGI Friday's Inc (Macaluso, Tricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order For ADR Fri 08/16 3:30 PM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints Jay Clark Zeleskey as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/18/2025. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 8/16/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
12 12 misc Status Report Wed 08/14 1:00 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Naming Mediator filed by Telgian Corporation. (Brown, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/11 9:59 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 9/15/2025 before Judge Jane J Boyle. Joinder of Parties due by 7/31/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2024. Motions due by 3/31/2025. Discovery due by 5/19/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/18/2025. Pretrial Order due by 9/2/2025. Pretrial Materials due by 9/2/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2025 10:00 AM before Judge Jane J Boyle. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 7/10/2024) (cfk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Thu 06/20 1:25 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by TGI Friday's Inc. (Macaluso, Tricia)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
9 9 order Status Report Order Mon 06/03 3:06 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 6/24/2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 6/3/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 05/30 10:38 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TGI Friday's Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Macaluso, Tricia)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/30 10:36 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by TGI Friday's Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Macaluso, Tricia)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/10 9:47 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant TGI Friday's, Inc. must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before May 30, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Jane J Boyle on 5/10/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/08 9:18 AM
Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by TGI Friday's Inc Attorney Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso added to party TGI Friday's Inc(pty:dft) (Macaluso, Tricia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Tue 04/23 1:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to TGI Friday's Inc; served on 4/18/2024. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 04/11 10:02 AM
Summons Issued as to TGI Friday's Inc. (kcr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
2 2 qcref Boyle Thu 04/11 10:00 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against TGI Friday's, Inc. filed by Telgian Corporation. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14529956) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Townsend, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet