BLACK v. Coinbase, Inc.
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Susan Paradise Baxter |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00106 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday May 25, 2024 7:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
COINBASE, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
SAMUEL P. BLACK, III
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Staying Case
Fri 07/26 9:54 AM
ORDER: Good cause appearing, it is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff Samuel P. Black, III's claims against Defendant Coinbase, Inc., as set forth in his Complaint, are hereby compelled to arbitration pursuant to the Joint Stipulation to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, ECF No.10 , between Plaintiff and Coinbase. The proceedings are hereby stayed pending completion of the arbitration. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/26/2024. (snc) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/24 2:27 PM
STIPULATION to Compel Arbitration by COINBASE, INC.. (Croft, Blaec) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/18 9:17 AM
TEXT ORDER granting8 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: NOW, this 18th Day of July, 2024, upon consideration of Defendant Coinbase, Inc.s Motion for Extension of Time to Answer8 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and the deadline for Coinbase, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended up to and including July 25, 2024. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 07/18/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 07/16 2:25 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by COINBASE, INC.. (Croft, Blaec) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/20 12:10 PM
TEXT ORDER: AND NOW, this 20th day of June, 2024, upon consideration of Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff Samuel P. Black, III's Complaint, ECF No.6 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Motion is GRANTED, and the deadline for Coinbase, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended up to and including July 18, 2024. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 6/20/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (snc) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 06/18 1:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 COMPLAINT, filed by SAMUEL P. BLACK, III or Respond to Complaint by COINBASE, INC.. (Croft, Blaec) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Fri 05/31 2:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Complaint served on Dave Bulakowski, Service Associate on 05/30/2024, filed by SAMUEL P. BLACK, III. (Nietupski, Gery) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2))
Mon 04/15 10:31 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, declaring citizenship by SAMUEL P. BLACK, III. (Nietupski, Gery) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/11 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to COINBASE, INC. (jkn) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 04/11 9:09 AM
Judge Susan Paradise Baxter added. (jkn) |
||
misc
QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/11 9:15 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Plaintiff did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship as required pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2). CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 4/18/2024. (jkn) |
||
misc
QC - Attorney Signature Deficient
Thu 04/11 11:42 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (jkn) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
30+
pgs
misc
Exhibits in Support
Wed 04/10 3:45 PM
EXHIBITS in Support of1 COMPLAINT by SAMUEL P. BLACK, III. (Nietupski, Gery) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required)
Wed 04/10 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8209186), filed by SAMUEL P. BLACK, III. (Nietupski, Gery) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |