LOUIS v. DEJOY
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | W Scott Hardy |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00541 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 4:08 PM EDT |
Defendant
LOUIS DEJOY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MARIE LOUIS
P.O. Box 6264
Pittsburgh, PA 15212 |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/17 3:59 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Plead, or Otherwise Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall answer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 5/21/2024. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 4/17/2024. (kas) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/17 1:55 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by LOUIS DEJOY. (Cressler, April) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/15 10:54 AM
ORDER on Motions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b). See Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 4/15/2024. (kas) |
|
2 | 2
adr
Notice of ADR Designation
Mon 04/15 10:54 AM
NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. The Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the Stipulation of Selecting an ADR process and Neutral. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing Defendant(s)) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kas) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 04/11 8:25 AM
Judge W. Scott Hardy added. (keh) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
ATTORNEY Notice of Removal (Credit Card Required)
Wed 04/10 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 23-3571 (), filed by LOUIS DEJOY. (Cressler, April) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A |