Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Referred: Hal R Ray, Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-00319
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:May 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 3:48 AM CDT
Defendant
Cullen/Frost Bankers, Inc.
Plaintiff
Drue Allen Hollis
PO Box 101871
Fort Worth, TX 76185


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, March 06, 2025
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/07 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Request of Order to Vacate and Correct Award, similar to17 MOTION to Vacate And Correct Award filed by Drue Hollis. (sre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Wed 03/05 3:53 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate and Correct Award (ECF No.19 ), filed March 4, 2025. The Court summarily DENIES Plaintiff's Motion. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/5/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
19 19 motion Vacate Tue 03/04 8:50 AM
MOTION to Vacate and Correct Award filed by Drue A Hollis. (sre) (sre). (Main Document 19 replaced on 3/4/2025) (sre)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/4/2025) Additional Page(s)
Thursday, February 27, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Vacate Thu 02/27 1:44 PM
ORDER : Before the Court is Plaintiff's17 Motion to Vacate and Correct Award. The Court summarily DENIES Plaintiff's Motion. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/27/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
17 17 motion Vacate Wed 02/26 11:45 PM
MOTION to Vacate And Correct Award filed by Drue A Hollis (Hollis, Drue)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Additional Page(s)
Monday, February 24, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Mon 02/24 1:37 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's15 Motion to Withdraw Funds from the Registry. The Court summarily DENIES Plaintiff's Motion. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 2/24/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
15 15 motion Withdraw Fri 02/21 2:09 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Funds from the Registry filed by Drue Hollis (mmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/03 2:29 PM
Public Correspondence filed by Drue Hollis. (sre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/26 1:28 PM
USPS Certified Mail Green Card filed by Drue Allen Hollis. (New address noted: 1809 Burton Hill Rd, Fort Worth) (bdb) Modified docket text on 6/26/2024 (bdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/26 1:26 PM
USPS Return Receipt for International Mail/Notice of New Address filed by Drue Allen Hollis. (bdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Wed 05/22 10:44 AM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE8 : The United States Magistrate Judge made Findings, Conclusions, and a Recommendation in this case. No objections were filed. The District Judge reviewed the proposed Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation for plain error. Finding none, the Court ACCEPTS the Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Civil Action (ECF Nos.1 , 3 ) is DENIED, and the Clerk SHALL administratively close this case. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/22/2024) (sre)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/13 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Order and Judgment and Default Judgment, filed by Drue Allen Hollis. (sre)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/26 9:01 AM
NOTICE filed by Drue Allen Hollis. (sre)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Findings and Recommendations Fri 04/26 8:58 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Judge O'Connor should DENY Hollis's Motion for Leave to File a Civil Action (ECF Nos.1 , 3 ) and ORDER the Clerk to administratively close the case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 4/26/2024) (sre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
7 7 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Wed 04/10 2:58 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre)
Related: [-]
6 6 qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Wed 04/10 2:57 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] index and to the prior sanctions found within the[LINK:circuit] index.) File to: Appropriate Staff Attorney. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr. (sre)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 04/10 2:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Drue Hollis. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (sre)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/10 2:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Drue Hollis. (sre)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Default Judgment Wed 04/10 2:52 PM
MOTION for Entry By Default filed by Drue Hollis. (See doc1 for document). (sre)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Leave to File Wed 04/10 2:50 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Civil Action filed by Drue Hollis. (See doc1 for document). (sre)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 2:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Cullen/Frost Bankers, Inc. filed by Drue Hollis. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 04/10 3:04 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Wed Apr 10 15:04:24 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]