EPR INVESTMENTS, L.C.
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Catherine Peek Mcewen |
Case #: | 8:24-bk-01969 |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
EPR INVESTMENTS, L.C.
4904 W Waters Ave
Tampa, FL 33634-1302 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 04/30 3:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brian T FitzGerald on behalf of Creditor Hillsborough County Tax Collector. (FitzGerald, Brian) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Mon 04/29 11:32 AM
Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Application to Employ Robert F. Elgidely and the law firm of Fox Rothschild LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor Filed by Robert F Elgidely on behalf of Debtor EPR Investments, L.C. . Hearing scheduled for 6/6/2024 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Elgidely, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix | ||
Sunday, April 28, 2024 | ||
court
Prepare Hearing Notice - Automation Use Only
Sun 04/28 11:34 AM
Preliminary Hearing Scheduled for 06/06/2024 02:00 PM Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue. Re: Application to Employ ROBERT F. ELGIDELY and the law firm of FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP as Attorney for the Debtor Doc14 . This entry is not an official notice of hearing from the court. Noticing Instructions : The Court directs Robert F Elgidely to prepare, file, and serve a notice of hearing that includes the information on the Notice of Hearing Sample Form available at https://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/proguide/documents/Samples/Notice_of_Hearing_Bankruptcy_Sample_Form.pdf?id=1 Counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing on interested parties within 3 days. If the hearing is on an Emergency/Expedited matter, then counsel must file and serve the notice of hearing immediately upon receipt of this directive. If the notice of hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. If notice of the hearing is not timely served and filed, then the Court will remove it from the hearing calendar and, in its discretion, may deny the relief requested. . (Bill) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Compliance (BK)
Thu 04/25 2:42 PM
Notice of Compliance With Order Granting Motion For Admission Of Jeanette E. McPherson To Practice Pro Hac Vice, Designation Of Local Counsel, And Consent To Act Filed by Robert F Elgidely on behalf of Debtor EPR Investments, L.C. . (Elgidely, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 04/25 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 04/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
court
Service of Previously Entered Order/Notice
Mon 04/22 1:26 PM
Service of Previously Entered Order/Notice via Bankruptcy Noticing Center. Title of Previously Entered Document: Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Jeanette E. McPherson for EPR Investments, L.C. Entered on the Docket April 16, 2024 . (Anel) |
|
court
ADI - Proof of Service Reminder - 3-day
Mon 04/22 12:16 AM
A properly docketed and related Proof or Certificate of Service for Order17 is not indicated on the docket. Robert Elgidely is reminded to serve the order and to file a properly docketed and related Proof of Service indicating service or contact the Court if this reminder entry appears to be entered in error. Failure to do so may result in further action. (ADIclerk) |
||
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice (BK)
Sat 04/20 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing . Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
22 | 22
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 04/20 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors. . Notice Date 04/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
SCHEDULES (original schedules, individual schedules or amended schedules)
Thu 04/18 7:09 PM
Schedule A/B, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required. Filed by Robert F Elgidely on behalf of Debtor EPR Investments, L.C.. (Elgidely, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Thu 04/18 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 04/17/2024. (Admin.) |
|
19 | 19
court
Notice of Hearing / Status Conference / Reaffirmation Hearing
Wed 04/17 2:21 PM
Notice of Status Conference . Hearing scheduled for 6/6/2024 at 02:00 PM at Tampa, FL - Courtroom 8B, Sam M. Gibbons United States Courthouse, 801 N. Florida Avenue . (Cathy P.) |
|
18 | 18
court
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 11 Corp w/Claim Deadline
Wed 04/17 2:17 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Case . Section 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/15/2024 at 01:30 PM. U.S. Trustee (T/FM) will hold the meeting telephonically. Call in Number: 866-910-0293. Passcode: 7560574. Proofs of Claims due by 6/20/2024. (Cathy P.) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 04/16 2:44 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice of Jeanette E. Mcpherson for EPR Investments, L.C.. Upon completion of the required registration form, a temporary login and password will be issued. Filing privileges are limited to this case and any related adversary proceedings. The attorney is directed to file a statement notifying the Clerk when Attorneys involvement in this case is concluded . Service Instructions: Robert Elgidely is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.) |
|
Monday, April 15, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Motion to Appear pro hac vice (BK)
Mon 04/15 3:27 PM
|
|
15 | 15
3
pgs
order
Order (Generic)
Mon 04/15 3:26 PM
Order Prescribing Consequences of Failure to File Operating Reports and Pay Quarterly Fees Timely . Service Instructions: Clerks Office to serve. (Deborah K.) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Application to Employ/Retain
Mon 04/15 3:21 PM
|
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Sat 04/13 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . Notice Date 04/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/12 12:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Demand for Service of Papers Filed by Paul B Thanasides on behalf of Interested Party Evan Rubinson. (Thanasides, Paul) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/12 9:53 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Cameryn Rebecca Lackey on behalf of Creditor Pamela Keris-Rubinson. (Lackey, Cameryn) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/12 9:50 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Nicholas Lafalce on behalf of Creditor Pamela Keris-Rubinson. (Lafalce, Nicholas) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 04/12 9:48 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by John A Anthony on behalf of Creditor Pamela Keris-Rubinson. (Anthony, John) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 04/11 4:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jeffrey W. Warren on behalf of Interested Party Elliott P. Rubinson Revocable Trust. (Warren, Jeffrey) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance on behalf of United States Trustee (Attorneys for U.S. Trustee Only)
Thu 04/11 2:21 PM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Nicole Peair on behalf of U.S. Trustee United States Trustee - TPA. (Peair, Nicole) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 04/11 10:38 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by J Ellsworth Summers Jr. on behalf of Creditor Valley National Bank. (Summers, J) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary
Wed 04/10 7:48 PM
Chapter 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Robert F Elgidely on behalf of Debtor EPR INVESTMENTS, L.C. . (Elgidely, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Authorizing DIP to Operate Business
Wed 04/10 4:57 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor-In-Possession to Operate Business. (ADIclerk) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition
Wed 04/10 4:18 PM
Certificate of Authorization to File Bankruptcy Petition Filed by Robert F Elgidely on behalf of Debtor EPR INVESTMENTS, L.C. . (Elgidely, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Statement of Corporate Ownership
Wed 04/10 4:07 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership. Filed by Robert F Elgidely on behalf of Debtor EPR INVESTMENTS, L.C. . (Elgidely, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
30+
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 04/10 3:59 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Summary of Assets, Statement of Financial Affairs Disclosure of Compensation, Filed by Robert F Elgidely on behalf of EPR INVESTMENTS, L.C.. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/8/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 08/8/2024. (Elgidely, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor | ||
court
ADI - Notice to Debtor(s) Attorney Regarding Local Rule 2081-1 (Paperless Entry)
Wed 04/10 9:00 PM
Debtor(s) Attorney and Unrepresented Debtor(s) are directed to comply with all requirements set forth in Local Rule 2081-1. The Court's Local Rule can be found at[LINK:http://www.flmb.uscourts.gov/localrules/rules/2081-1.pdf] . (ADIclerk) |
||
court
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic (BK)
Thu 04/11 8:12 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee. Receipt Number A75071819, Fee Amount $1738.00 Voluntary Petition under Chapter 11 . (Anel) |