Saldivar v. Warehouse Recon, LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Charlene Edwards Honeywel |
Referred: | Natalie Hirt Adams |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00885 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Jose Saldana
|
|
Defendant
Nelson Saldivar
|
|
Defendant
Warehouse Recon, LLC
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons returned unexecuted
Thu 05/02 10:22 AM
SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Nelson Saldivar as to Jose Saldana. (Schlade, Daniel) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons returned unexecuted
Thu 05/02 10:22 AM
SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Nelson Saldivar as to Warehouse Recon, LLC. (Schlade, Daniel) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/12 12:51 PM
NOTICE by Nelson Saldivar Updated Disclosure Statement (Schlade, Daniel) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Referral to IDEAL Program
Fri 04/12 9:57 AM
NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (CDR) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 04/11 12:27 PM
NOTICE by Nelson Saldivar Local Rule 3.03 Statement (Schlade, Daniel) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons issued
Thu 04/11 11:38 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Jose Saldana, Warehouse Recon, LLC. (EVK) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/11 10:05 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-885-CEH-NHA. (RLK) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of appearance
Wed 04/10 7:13 PM
NOTICE of Plaintiff's Appearance by Daniel Schlade on behalf of Nelson Saldivar (Schlade, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
service
Proposed summons
Wed 04/10 7:11 PM
PROPOSED summons to be issued by Nelson Saldivar.(Schlade, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Warehouse Recon, LLC and Jose Saldana by Plaintiff Nelson Saldivar against Nelson Saldivar with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21968798) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Schlade, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Wages Spreadsheet |