Southern-Owners Insurance Company v. Antioch Contracting LLC et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Charlene Edwards Honeywel |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-00886 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 5:11 PM EDT |
Defendant
Antioch Contracting LLC
|
|
Defendant
Canco General Contractors, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
TKM Aviation LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Southern-Owners Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 04/23 8:47 AM
RETURN of service executed on 4/22/2024 by Southern-Owners Insurance Company as to Canco General Contractors, Inc. (Chambers, William) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons returned executed
Tue 04/16 2:58 PM
RETURN of service executed on 4/16/2024 by Southern-Owners Insurance Company as to Antioch Contracting LLC. (Chambers, William) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/12 3:03 PM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAB) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/12 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAB) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Lead Counsel Designation
Fri 04/12 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by William S. Chambers, IV on behalf of Southern-Owners Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: William S. Chambers, IV. (Chambers, William) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons issued
Fri 04/12 8:57 AM
SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (EVK) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice to Counsel of Local Rule
Fri 04/12 8:51 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL William S. Chambers, IV of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK) |
|
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Standing Order
Fri 04/12 8:57 AM
STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 4/11/2024. (KMN) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 04/11 3:55 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:24-cv-886-CEH-TGW. (TNP) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 3:47 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21968783) filed by Southern-Owners Insurance Company.(Chambers, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons Antioch Contracting, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons Canco General Contractors, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons TKM Aviation |