Helm v. Commissioner of Social Security
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Regina S Edwards |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00228 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 10:07 AM
MOTION for Clifford M. Farrell to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4014421. by Plaintiff Gregory S. Helm (Farrell, Clifford) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, April 11, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Social Security Case Assignment
Thu 04/11 11:18 AM
Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 5/2/2024. (HMC) |
|
5 | 5
service
SSA Notice of Service
Thu 04/11 11:12 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE: Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and[LINK:General Order 2023-2:] , the Court hereby notifies the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Kentucky that a Complaint seeking judicial review has been filed. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the official notification referenced in Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions. The plaintiff does not need to serve separately a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Entry. No Document is attached. (HMC) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 04/11 11:10 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 04/11/2024 granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is ordered to file Plaintiff's Complaint. The Clerk is directed to transmit a Notice of Electronic Filing to the appropriate office within the Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and to the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Kentucky. Service need not be accomplished under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. cc: Counsel (HMC) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/10 4:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gregory S. Helm. (DeW) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Wed 04/10 4:42 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. (DeW) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 04/10 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Gregory S. Helm against Commissioner of Social Security. (DeW) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |