North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Max O Cogburn, Jr
Referred: Susan C Rodriguez
Case #: 3:24-cv-00378
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 10, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 07, 2024 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Carl H. Petkoff
Maynard Nexsen PC
contact info
Nikole Setzler Mergo
Maynard Nexsen
contact info
Jessica L. Klander
Bassford Remele
contact info
Plaintiff
Jerry Robinson
Represented By
John Mansfield Harris, Jr
J. Harris Legal PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, November 14, 2024
13 13 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/14 12:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC (All Claims Dismissed. Case to be Closed). (Petkoff, Carl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
12 12 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Wed 07/31 3:14 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,4 Answer to Complaint, by Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC. (Petkoff, Carl)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Stipulation Wed 07/31 3:08 PM
STIPULATION re4 Answer to Complaint Joint Stipulation Regarding Amended Answer to Strike Affirmative Defense by Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC (Petkoff, Carl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/20 3:37 PM
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jessica L. Klander for Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 6/20/2024. (mek)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Thu 06/20 2:13 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jessica L. Klander Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6564295. by Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC. (Petkoff, Carl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Thu 06/20 3:37 PM
Notice to Jessica L. Klander: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 6/27/2024. (mek)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/18 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carl H. Petkoff on behalf of Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC (Petkoff, Carl)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
7 7 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/14 2:02 PM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: Two (2) Days. Discovery due by 11/15/2024. Mediation deadline set for 11/29/2024. Motions due by 12/16/2024. Bench Trial set for 4/21/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 6/14/2024. (brl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
6 6 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Thu 06/13 9:20 PM
Consent CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Harris, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Fri 05/24 8:01 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 6/14/2024. (ams)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/23 5:31 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC. (Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/23 4:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC.(Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 05/14 8:13 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint. Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC's answer due 5/23/2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez on 5/14/2024. (DLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
3 3 motion Extension of Time Mon 05/13 5:45 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint by Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC. (Mergo, Nikole)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 04/11 2:09 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Arcon Credit Solutions, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (tlj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 04/11 2:07 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and US Magistrate Judge Susan C. Rodriguez. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tlj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/10 2:51 PM
COMPLAINT 3:24-CV-00378 against Arcon Credit Solutions LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6478146), filed by Jerry Robinson.(Harris, John)
Related: [-]