Long Point Energy, LLC v. Gulfport Appalachia LLC et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Sarah D Morrison |
Referred: | Kimberly A Jolson |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01673 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 10, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Belmont County Common Pleaas Court, 23-cv-0115 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 10, 2024 5:16 PM EDT |
Defendant
Nancy L. Garrison
|
|
Defendant
Gulfport Appalachia LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dedra D. Perkins
|
|
Defendant
Jackie M. Perkins
|
|
Defendant
Jill E. Perkins
|
|
Defendant
Michael A. Perkins
|
|
Defendant
Mitchell G. Perkins
|
|
Defendant
Philip J. Perkins
|
|
Defendant
Rice Drilling D, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Long Point Energy, LLC
5646 Milton Street Ste. 205
Dallas, TX 75206 |
Docket last updated: 04/30/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 04/26 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2024 10:15 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr) |
|
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Thu 04/25 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Richard Joseph Sarcone substituting for Syed Ahmadul Huda as to Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC. (Sarcone, Richard) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
order
Related Case Memorandum
Fri 04/19 9:29 AM
RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:20-cv-4644 ARE related. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson for all further proceedings. Judge Sarah D. Morrison remains the presiding judge. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 4/19/2024. (kk2) |
|
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/18 10:31 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting20 and21 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anna Rotman and Kenneth Alan Young as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/18/2024. (kk2) |
|
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 7:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9925472) of Kenneth Alan Young by Cross Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC. (Baronzzi, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Supreme Court Certification | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear - Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/17 7:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-9925468) of Anna Rotman by Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC. (Baronzzi, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Supreme Court Certification | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Wed 04/17 5:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss Perkins Plaintiffs' Claims by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia LLC, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Lease, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Map, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Map, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Map, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Well Record, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G-Well Record, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I-Well Record, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K-Well Record, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M-Well Record, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O-Well Record, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q-Well Record, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit S-Well Record, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit T-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit U-Well Record, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit V-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit W-Well Record, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit X-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Y-Well Record, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Z-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit AA-Well Record, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit BB-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit CC-Well Record, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit DD-Well Permit, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit EE-Well Record, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit FF-Well permit | ||
18 | 18
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/17 4:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Rice Drilling D, LLC, Rice Drilling D, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rice Drilling D, LLC for Rice Drilling D, LLC.. (Baronzzi, Christopher) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/17 4:48 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC Citizenship Disclosure Statement of Rice Drilling D, LLC (Baronzzi, Christopher) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/17 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Baronzzi for Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC (Baronzzi, Christopher) |
|
misc
Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2)
Thu 04/18 10:09 AM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Rice Drilling D, LLC SEE DOCKET # 17 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to utilize the correct filing event, "Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2)," which can be found in the "Other Documents" section of CM/ECF (kk2) |
||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Counterclaim
Mon 04/15 11:45 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand to5 Complaint; CROSSCLAIM against Rice Drilling D LLC, Gulfport Appalachia LLC, and Gulfport Energy Corporation; and COUNTERCLAIM against Long Point Energy, LLC filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court on 3/18/2024 by Mitchell G. Perkins, Dedra D. Perkins, Jackie M. Perkins, Philip J. Perkins, Michael A. Perkins, Nancy L. Garrison, and Jill E. Perkins (kk2) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Withdraw
Mon 04/15 11:38 AM
MOTION to Withdraw re6 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court on 3/18/2024 by Defendants Nancy L. Garrison, Dedra D. Perkins, Jackie M. Perkins, Jill E. Perkins, Michael A. Perkins, Mitchell G. Perkins, and Philip J. Perkins (kk2) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 04/15 11:36 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Strike Insufficient Claims filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court on 8/22/2023 by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia LLC and Rice Drilling D LLC (kk2) |
|
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/15 11:33 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Strike Insufficient Claims filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court on 8/8/2023 by Plaintiff Long Point Energy LLC (kk2) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 04/15 11:30 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 MOTION to Strike Insufficient Claims filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court on 7/24/2023 by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia LLC, Rice Drilling D, LLC, and Plaintiff Long Point Energy, LLC (kk2) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 04/15 11:27 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court on 7/24/2023 by Defendants Nancy L. Garrison, Dedra D. Perkins, Jackie M. Perkins, Jill E. Perkins, Michael A. Perkins, Mitchell G. Perkins, and Philip J. Perkins (kk2) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 04/15 11:25 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court on 7/19/2023 by Plaintiff Long Point Energy LLC (kk2) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Strike
Mon 04/15 11:21 AM
MOTION to Strike Insufficient Claims filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court on 6/27/2023 by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia LLC & Rice Drilling D LLC (kk2) |
|
6 | 6
motion
More Definite Statement
Mon 04/15 11:18 AM
MOTION for More Definite Statement filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court on 6/20/2023 by Defendants Nancy L. Garrison, Dedra D. Perkins, Jackie M. Perkins, Jill E. Perkins, Michael A. Perkins, Mitchell G. Perkins, and Philip J. Perkins (kk2) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/15 11:03 AM
COMPLAINT filed in Belmont County Common Pleas Court on 4/26/2023 by Long Point Energy LLC against Nancy L. Garrison, Gulfport Appalachia LLC, Dedra D. Perkins, Jackie M. Perkins, Jill E. Perkins, Michael A. Perkins, Mitchell G. Perkins, Philip J. Perkins, and Rice Drilling D LLC (kk2) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/10 5:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gulfport Appalachia LLC. (West, John) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Diversity Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a)(2)
Wed 04/10 5:34 PM
Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gulfport Appalachia LLC. (West, John) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Sever
Wed 04/10 5:29 PM
MOTION to Sever And Remand Claims Barred By The Rooker-Feldman Doctrine by Defendants Gulfport Appalachia LLC, Rice Drilling D, LLC. (West, John) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 04/10 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Belmont County Common Pleas, case number 23-CV-0115 ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9913610), filed by Rice Drilling D, LLC, Gulfport Appalachia LLC. (West, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proof of Claims, | ||
Att: 2 Docket, | ||
Att: 3 County Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Appearance, | ||
Att: 5 Motion for Extension, | ||
Att: 6 Docket and Journal Entry, | ||
Att: 7 Motion for More Definite Statement, | ||
Att: 8 Notice of Motion, | ||
Att: 9 Notice of Motion, | ||
Att: 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, | ||
Att: 11 Reply to Motion, | ||
Att: 12 Joint Motion to Strike, | ||
Att: 13 Joint Motion for Extension, | ||
Att: 14 Response in Opposition, | ||
Att: 15 Reply in Support of Joint Motion, | ||
Att: 16 Motion to Withdraw, | ||
Att: 17 Answer, | ||
Att: 18 Summons on Answer, | ||
Att: 19 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 20 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/15 11:00 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Gulfport Energy Corporation for Defendant Gulfport Appalachia LLC. SEE DOCKET # 4 FOR DOCUMENT . This entry is being created to add the corporate parent for the filing party, which was not entered by counsel when the document was filed (kk2) |